This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2019 at 07:22:07 (UTC).

John S. Shepard Family Trust et al v. NH Hotels USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 John S Shepard Family Trust filed an Other lawsuit against NH Hotels USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Analisa Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-09026

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Shepard Family Trust

Lawrence Jaffe

John S. Shepard

John S. Shepard Family Trust

Defendants

NH Hotel Group, S.A.

NH Hotels USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary Steven Graifman

Attorney at Kantrowitz Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.

747 Chestnut Ridge Road

Chestnut Ridge, NY 10977

Tod Aronovitz

Attorney at Aronovitz Law

2 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Ste 3700

Miami, FL 33131

Barbara Perez

Attorney at Aronovitz Law

2 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Ste 3700

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Scott Connolly

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 49Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

David Alexander Shargel

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 49Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

10 #2

Text of Proposed Order

10 #1

Affidavit

#10

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Affidavit

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: NH Hotel Group, S.A. answer due 12/9/2019; NH Hotels USA, Inc. answer due 12/9/2019., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 11:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (rj) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. By December 9, 2019, Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for December 2, 2019 is ADJOURNED to December 19, 2019 at 11:40 a.m. By December 12, 2019, the parties shall submit their joint letter and case management plan. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/6/2019) (rj) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Daniel S. Connolly dated November 6, 2019 re: Clarifying Defendants' Letter Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint. Document filed by NH Hotel Group, S.A., NH Hotels USA, Inc..(Connolly, Daniel) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Alexander Shargel on behalf of NH Hotel Group, S.A., NH Hotels USA, Inc.. (Shargel, David) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Daniel S. Connolly dated November 6, 2019. Document filed by NH Hotel Group, S.A., NH Hotels USA, Inc..(Connolly, Daniel) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. NH Hotels USA, Inc. served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by John S. Shepard Family Trust; Lawrence Jaffe; John S. Shepard. (Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. NH Hotel Group, S.A. served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal, Legal Clerk. Document filed by John S. Shepard Family Trust; Lawrence Jaffe; John S. Shepard. (Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Tod Aronovitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (JT) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Barbara Perez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (JT) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Tod Aronovitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17709646. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #9 MOTION for Barbara Perez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17709515. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NH Hotel Group, S.A.. (pne) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gary Steven Graifman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 21:881; Dollar Demand None; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331ot; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $2,034,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gary Steven Graifman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John S. Shepard Family Trust, John S. Shepard, Lawrence Jaffe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (pne) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NH Hotels USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lawrence Jaffe, John Shepard Family Trust, John S. Shepard. (Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NH Hotel Group, S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Lawrence Jaffe, John Shepard Family Trust, John S. Shepard. (Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NH Hotel Group, S.A., NH Hotels USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17678794)Document filed by John Shepard Family Trust, Lawrence Jaffe, John S. Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Proposed Decision)(Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel S. Connolly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Alexander Shargel