This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 18:16:31 (UTC).

John P. Norton, on behalf of the Norton Family Living Trust UAD 11/15/2002 v. Nutanix, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 John P Norton, on behalf of the Norton Family Living Trust UAD 11/15/2002 filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Nutanix, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-04080

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John P. Norton, on behalf of the Norton Family Living Trust UAD

Defendants

Duston M. Williams

Dheeraj Pandey

Nutanix, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Marc Apton

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

388 Market Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Shannon L Hopkins

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

1111 Summer Street, Suite 403

Stamford, CT 06905

Adam Christopher McCall

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

388 Market Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Evan L Seite

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati PC

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Laura G. Amadon

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Nina F. Locker

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Ignacio Evaristo Salceda

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed in In re Nutanix, Inc. S

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Shannon L. Hopkins. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge William H. Orrick granting #13 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2021) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Nutanix, Inc., Dheeraj Pandey, Duston M. Williams. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 7/20/2021) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nutanix, Inc., Dheeraj Pandey, Duston M. Williams (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 7/20/2021) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Ignacio Evaristo Salceda , Nina F. Locker, Evan L. Seite, and Laura G. Amadon (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 7/20/2021) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16192332.) filed by John P. Norton, on behalf of the Norton Family Living Trust UAD 11/15/2002. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hopkins, Shannon) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RELATED CASE ORDER. This matter is found to be related to Case No. 19-cv-1651-WHO. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 6/2/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John P. Norton, on behalf of the Norton Family Living Trust UAD 11/15/2002. Service waived by All Defendants. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by John P. Norton, on behalf of the Norton Family Living Trust UAD 11/15/2002 of Related Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed in In re Nutanix, Inc. Securities Litigation, Case No. 3:19-cv-01651-WHO (N.D. Cal.))(McCall, Adam) (Filed on 6/1/2021) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Nutanix, Inc., Dheeraj Pandey, Duston M. Williams. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 5/28/2021) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16021627.). Filed byJohn P. Norton, on behalf of the Norton Family Living Trust UAD 11/15/2002. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCall, Adam) (Filed on 5/28/2021) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less