This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:44:44 (UTC).

John P. Haines v. Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 John P Haines filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony E. Porcelli and Mary S. Scriven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02995

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John P. Haines

Defendant

Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Harris Eggnatz

Attorney at Eggnatz Pascucci, P.A.

7450 Griffin Rd Ste 230

Davie, FL 33314-4104

Seth Michael Lehrman

Attorney at Edwards Pottinger LLC

425 N Andrews Ave Ste 2

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301-3268

Richard B. Feinberg

Attorney at Florida Legacy Law, LLC

600 Cleveland St Ste 313

Clearwater, FL 33755

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Neil Golant

Attorney at Fidelity National Law Group

Suite 210, 200 W Cypress Creek Rd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309-2175

Mary Ellen Roy Himes

Attorney at Fidelity National Law Group

Suite 210, 200 W Cypress Creek Rd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309-2175

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Preliminary Rule 16 Conference by John P. Haines. (Eggnatz, Joshua) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. Related case(s): yes (Golant, Jeffrey) Modified text on 1/23/2020 (JNB). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#15

(#15) Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave to Conduct Telephonic Case Management Conference by John P. Haines. (Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by John P. Haines. Related case(s): No. (Eggnatz, Joshua) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#12

(#12) ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #4 Amended Complaint by Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc.(Golant, Jeffrey) Modified text on 1/16/2020 (JNB). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#10

(#10) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/22/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/8/2020. (APV) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#9

(#9) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/22/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/8/2020. (APV) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ellen Roy Himes on behalf of Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. (Himes, Mary Ellen) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer as to #4 Amended Complaint by Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. (Golant, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/23/2019 (AG). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Neil Golant on behalf of Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. (Golant, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by John P. Haines. (Eggnatz, Joshua) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit B: Closing Statement

4 #1

Exhibit A: As Is Contract

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by John P. Haines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: As Is Contract, #2 Exhibit B: Closing Statement)(Eggnatz, Joshua) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc. for Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. (Golant, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/13/2019 (JNB). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #5

State Court Other Documents

1 #4

State Court Docket Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Preliminary Rule 16 Conference by John P. Haines. (Eggnatz, Joshua) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #15 Joint Motion for Leave to Conduct Telephonic Case Management Conference. The Parties are relieved of the requirement to meet in person for purpose of conducting the case management conference. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/23/2020. (APF) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. Related case(s): yes (Golant, Jeffrey) Modified text on 1/23/2020 (JNB). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave to Conduct Telephonic Case Management Conference by John P. Haines. (Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Lehrman, Seth) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by John P. Haines. Related case(s): No. (Eggnatz, Joshua) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #4 Amended Complaint by Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc.(Golant, Jeffrey) Modified text on 1/16/2020 (JNB). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #7 Defendant Fidelity National Title of Florida Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Amended Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including January 15, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/9/2020. (APF) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/22/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/8/2020. (APV) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/22/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/8/2020. (APV) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ellen Roy Himes on behalf of Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. (Himes, Mary Ellen) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer as to #4 Amended Complaint by Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. (Golant, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/23/2019 (AG). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Neil Golant on behalf of Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. (Golant, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by John P. Haines. (Eggnatz, Joshua) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by John P. Haines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: As Is Contract, #2 Exhibit B: Closing Statement)(Eggnatz, Joshua) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc. for Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc. (Golant, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/13/2019 (JNB). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-2995-T-35AEP. (SJB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 6th Judicial Circuit -Pinellas County, case number 19-007322-CI filed in State Court on 11/4/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16221247 filed by Fidelity National Title of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Barbara Mott Howe, #3 State Court COMPLAINT With Attached Exhibits, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 State Court Other Documents)(Golant, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.