This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2022 at 07:53:29 (UTC).

JOHN FYNES, ET AL v. BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 JOHN FYNES, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03398

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN FYNES

MARYANN FYNES

Cross Defendants and Defendants

BRAND INSULATIONS, INC.

CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.,

CONWED CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GARDNER DENVER, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC

GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO.

GOODYEAR CANADA, INC.

GOULDS PUMPS, INC.

GRINNELL LLC D/B/A GRINNELL CORPORATION; C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEMS

H.B. FULLER COMPANY

HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.

ITT CORPORATION

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JASON B. DUNCAN

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter Angelos

2001 N. Front Street, Suite 330

Harrisburg, PA 17102

Lauren Linsenbach

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter G. Angelos, PC

2001 N. Front St.

GREGORY N. BUNITSKY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PETER G. ANGELOS, P.C.

1880 John F Kennedy Blvd, Suite 1701

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

TIMOTHY COLIN CONNOR

Attorney at SEGAL MCCAMBRIDGE SINGER & MAHONEY

1818 Market St Ste 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

TIMOTHY D. RAU

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market St Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOHN P. MCSHEA

Attorney at MCSHEA LAW FIRM PC

1500 Market St Suite 4000

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JOSEPH I FONTAK

Attorney at LEADER & BERKON LLP

1515 Market St Suite 1200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Other Attorneys

G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.

Attorney at SWARTZ CAMPBELL, LLC

One Liberty Place 38Th Floor, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

BERNARD E. KUENY, III

Attorney at WILBRAHAM, LAWLER & BUBA

1818 Market Street, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JEFFREY L. PETTIT

Attorney at MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER

1617 John F. Kennedy Blvd, Suite 1500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOSHUA D. SCHEETS

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/18/22. 10/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#26

(#26) ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SUNOCO, INC. (R&M).(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#25

(#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (NEESON, PETER) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

24 #1

Exhibit A

24 #24

Main Document

18 #4

Exhibit

18 #2

Text of Proposed Order

18 #1

Brief

18 #18

Main Document

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GENERAL ELECTRIC.(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketPAPER #27 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/18/22. 10/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SUNOCO, INC. (R&M).(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (NEESON, PETER) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand (filed by General Electric Co. and) filed by CBS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SUNOCO, INC. (R&M).(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of SUNOCO, INC. (R&M) with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY COLIN CONNOR on behalf of FLOWSERVE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(CONNOR, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Linsenbach on behalf of JOHN FYNES, MARYANN FYNES with Certificate of Service(Linsenbach, Lauren) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY L. PETTIT on behalf of THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY with Certificate of Service(PETTIT, JEFFREY) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(NEESON, PETER) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J. NEESON on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(NEESON, PETER) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Docket(#7) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ke) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by General Electric Co. and filed by CBS CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ESAB Corporation by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GENERAL ELECTRIC.(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM, INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16129958), filed by CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM, INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/25/2022) (sbt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/25/2022) (sbt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/25/2022) (sbt). (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOODYEAR CANADA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BRAND INSULATIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONWED CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY is a litigant