This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2020 at 08:29:16 (UTC).

John Fayard Moving and Warehousing, LLC v. Double AA Construction Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 John Fayard Moving and Warehousing, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Double AA Construction Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Bert W. Milling, Jr and Callie V. S. Granade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00196

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bert W. Milling, Jr

Presiding Judge

Callie V. S. Granade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Fayard Moving and Warehousing, LLC

Defendant

Double AA Construction Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Wesley Causby

Attorney at Memory & Day

P. O. Box 4054

Montgomery, AL 36103-4054

Von G. Memory

Attorney at Memory & Day

P. O. Box 4054

Montgomery, AL 36103-4054

Stuart Hamilton Memory

Attorney at Memory & Day

P. O. Box 4054

Montgomery, AL 36103-4054

Stephen W. Dummer

Attorney at Dummer Law Firm, PLLC

796 Howard Avenue, First Floor

Biloxi, MS 39530

Defendant Attorneys

Frank E. Bankston, Jr.

Attorney at Webster, Henry, Lyons, Bradwell & Black, P.C.

P. O. Box 239

Montgomery, AL 36101

Micheal Stewart Jackson

Attorney at Webster, Henry, Lyons, Bradwell, Cohan & Black, P.C.

105 Tallapoosa St., Ste. 101 [36104], P. O. Box 239

Montgomery, AL 36101

 

Court Documents

18 #1

consent form

#18

#16

#15

#14

13 #2

Exhibit Certified return receipt

13 #1

Supplement Service via certified mail

#13

11 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #15 filed by Double AA Construction Company, LLC (Milling, Bert) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 5/7/2020. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #15 filed by Double AA Construction Company, LLC (APG) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Micheal Stewart Jackson on behalf of Double AA Construction Company, LLC (Jackson, Micheal) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Double AA Construction Company, LLC. (Bankston, Frank) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Double AA Construction Company, LLC. (Bankston, Frank) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed via Hand Delivery and via Certified Mail by John Fayard Moving and Warehousing, LLC. Double AA Construction Company, LLC served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Service via certified mail, #2 Exhibit Certified return receipt) (Memory, Stuart) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Stephen W. Dummer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 4/10/2020. (clr) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION and APPLICATION for Stephen W. Dummer to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (tot) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION and APPLICATION for Stephen W. Dummer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2600078, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by John Fayard Moving and Warehousing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Dummer, Stephen) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Reissue Summons Referred to Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by John Fayard Moving and Warehousing, LLC (APG) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Reissue Summons filed by John Fayard Moving and Warehousing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons) (Memory, Stuart) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by John Fayard Moving and Warehousing, LLC (Milling, Bert) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff John Fayard Moving and Warehousing, LLC. (Memory, Stuart) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Blank Disclosure Statement E-Mailed to Counsel for Plaintiff John Fayard Moving and Warehousing, LLC; Disclosure Statement Due 4/7/2020. Please list members of LLC. (tot) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Service Notice entered 3/31/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 5/11/2020. (tot) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Double AA Construction Company, LLC. (NOTE COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by William Wesley Causby on behalf of John Fayard Moving and Warehousing, LLC (Causby, William) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Double AA Construction Company, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2593685, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by John Fayard Moving and Warehousing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #4 Exhibit summons) (Memory, Stuart) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less