This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:35:17 (UTC).

John F. Hertz

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 John F Hertz was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-MC-00196

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

 

Party Details

Petitioner

John F. Hertz

Los Angeles, CA 90057

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR EXCEPTION FROM ELECTRONIC FILING by Judge George H. Wu re: #2 APPLICATION for Order. Mr. Hertz may file document on paper in Federal Court. This exception runs for one year from the date of this Order is entered, subject to renewal as provided in the Local Rule (mrgo) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION TO BE EXCEPTED FROM ELECTRONIC FILING, LOCAL RULE 5-4.2(a)(1) filed by movant John F. Hertz. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Proposed Lodged Order

#1

(#1) APPLICATION to be excepted from electronic filing, Local Rule 5-4.2(a)(2); and Proposed Order filed by John F. Hertz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Lodged Order) (car) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR EXCEPTION FROM ELECTRONIC FILING by Judge George H. Wu re: #2 APPLICATION for Order. Mr. Hertz may file document on paper in Federal Court. This exception runs for one year from the date of this Order is entered, subject to renewal as provided in the Local Rule (mrgo) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION TO BE EXCEPTED FROM ELECTRONIC FILING, LOCAL RULE 5-4.2(a)(1) filed by movant John F. Hertz. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION to be excepted from electronic filing, Local Rule 5-4.2(a)(2); and Proposed Order filed by John F. Hertz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Lodged Order) (car) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.