This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 07:39:57 (UTC).

John Doe v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 John Doe filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04217

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe

Defendant

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Hierl

Attorney at Hughes Socol PIers Resnick & Dym Ltd

Three First National Plaza, 70 West Madison Street, Suite 4000

Chicago, IL 60602

William Benjamin Kalbac

Attorney at Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.

Three First National Plaza, 70 W. Madison St., Suite#4000

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) MEMORANDUM by John Doe Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Joinder (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#18

(#18) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (smm, ) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff is given until August 3, 2020, to file a memorandum supporting joinder of defendants that engages in detail with the joinder framework set forth in the Court's June 22, 2020 order in Estee Lauder Cosmetics Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A," 20-cv-845 at ECF No. 40. Plaintiff may alternatively file an amended complaint that is in compliance with that framework. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Doe by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Doe by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by John Doe; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17225821.(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM by John Doe Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Joinder (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (smm, ) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SEALED DOCUMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(smm, ) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff is given until August 3, 2020, to file a memorandum supporting joinder of defendants that engages in detail with the joinder framework set forth in the Court's June 22, 2020 order in Estee Lauder Cosmetics Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A," 20-cv-845 at ECF No. 40. Plaintiff may alternatively file an amended complaint that is in compliance with that framework. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 2 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Part 1 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration Struck Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Reiter Declaration, #4 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication, MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe for temporary restraining order (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation, MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe for leave to file excess pages (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff John Doe to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Doe by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Doe by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 1 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by John Doe; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17225821.(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less