This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:46:52 (UTC).

L.P. et al v. School Board of Brevard County

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 L P filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against School Board of Brevard County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02308

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Doe by and through his mother and natural guardian, Mother Doe and Mother Doe, Individually

L.P.

N.C.

Defendants

School Board of Brevard County, Florida

School Board of Brevard County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brooke Sharmin

Attorney at Sharmin & Sharmin, P.A.

830 N. Federal Hwy.

Lake Worth, FL 33460

Defendant Attorney

Michael H. Bowling

Attorney at Bell & Roper, PA

2707 E Jefferson St

Orlando, FL 32803

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) ORDER striking Plaintiffs' complaint. Amended complaint due by December 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/9/2019. (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing Clerk to remove complaint from docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/10/2019. (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to another active District Judge in the division. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/10/2019. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against School Board of Brevard County with Jury Demand. filed by L.P., N.C. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Sharmin, Brooke) Modified on 12/12/2019 (BIA). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

9 #2

Proposed Summons

9 #1

Exhibit A

#23

(#23) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sharmin, Brooke) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#21

(#21) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at case management conference by L.P., N.C.. (Sharmin, Brooke) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/13/2020. (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#20

(#20) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by School Board of Brevard County.(Bowling, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by School Board of Brevard County. (Bowling, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#13

(#18) Remark: Doc. #13 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/30/2019. (EJV) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#8

(#17) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by School Board of Brevard County. (Bowling, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by School Board of Brevard County. Related case(s): no (Bowling, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#7

(#14) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by L.P., N.C.. Related case(s): no (Sharmin, Brooke) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sharmin, Brooke) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/13/2020. (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at case management conference by L.P., N.C.. (Sharmin, Brooke) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by School Board of Brevard County.(Bowling, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Remark: Doc. #17 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/30/2019. (EJV) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Remark: Doc. #13 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/30/2019. (EJV) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by School Board of Brevard County. (Bowling, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by School Board of Brevard County. Related case(s): no (Bowling, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Bowling on behalf of School Board of Brevard County (Bowling, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by L.P., N.C.. Related case(s): no (Sharmin, Brooke) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS issued as to School Board of Brevard County. (BIA) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against School Board of Brevard County with Jury Demand. filed by L.P., N.C. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Sharmin, Brooke) Modified on 12/12/2019 (BIA). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/11/2019. (ctp)(JLC) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket(#6) Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. New case number: 6:19-cv-2308-ORL-37GJK. Judge Anne C. Conway no longer assigned to the case. (MAA) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to another active District Judge in the division. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/10/2019. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER directing Clerk to remove complaint from docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/10/2019. (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER striking Plaintiffs' complaint. Amended complaint due by December 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/9/2019. (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-2308-ORL-22GJK. (LRB) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) (STRICKEN BY #3 ORDER AND REMOVED PER #4 ORDER) COMPLAINT against School Board of Brevard County, Florida with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16226919) filed by John Doe by and through his mother and natural guardian, Mother Doe and Mother Doe, Individually. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharmin, Brooke) Modified on 12/10/2019 (RDO). Modified on 12/11/2019 (BIA). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less