This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2022 at 08:38:34 (UTC).

John Brosnan v. Rodolfo Obeso et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 John Brosnan filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Rodolfo Obeso. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00942

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Brosnan

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendants

Rodolfo Obesa

Loya Casualty Insurance Company

DOES 1 to 9

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Brosnan, upon Defendant Loya Casualty Insurance Company served on 3/16/2022, answer due 4/6/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon individual refused to provide name in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.Original Summons NOT returned. (gk) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon the filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docket(#3) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendants Loya Casualty Insurance Company and Rodolfo Obesa. (jtil) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff John Brosnan. (jtil) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff John Brosnan against Defendants Loya Casualty Insurance Company, Rodolfo Obesa.Case assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 CV71) (jtil) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant