This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/12/2021 at 09:44:16 (UTC).

Jogaak v. State of South Dakota et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 Jogaak filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of South Dakota. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Veronica L. Duffy and Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-04023

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Veronica L. Duffy

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jogaak Deng Jogaak

Sioux Falls, SD 57103

Respondents

State of South Dakota

Amanda Schaefers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Matthew W. Templar

Attorney at Attorney General of South Dakota

1302 E. Highway 14, Suite 1

Pierre, SD 57501-8501

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Minnehaha County Docs

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

11 #1

E-court Search

11 #2

Writ

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: the court issued an order to show cause directing the parties to respond by March 12, 2021, as to whether Mr. Jogaak's habeas petition is timely. In response thereto, respondent filed a motion to dismiss on March 9, 2021. Mr. Jogaak has not filed a response. Mr. Jogaak is hereby advised the court will grant him until April 20, 2021, to file a response to respondent's motion to dismiss. MR. JOGAAK IS HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT FAILURE TO FILE A WRITTEN RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF HIS HABEAS PETITION. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 04/06/2021. (Duffy, Veronica) MAILED to Mr. Jogaak on 4/6/2021 (SAC). (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to DISMISS APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Amanda Schaefers, State of South Dakota. (Attachments: #1 E-court Search, #2 Writ) (Templar, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Filing Error: #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Templar, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) (FILED IN ERROR) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to DISMISS APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Amanda Schaefers, State of South Dakota. (Templar, Matthew) Modified on 3/9/2021 (SAC). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to DISMISS APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Amanda Schaefers, State of South Dakota. (Templar, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Templar on behalf of Amanda Schaefers, State of South Dakota. (Templar, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of change of physical address by Jogaak Deng Jogaak. Petitioner will notify us if mailing address changes. (SLW) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE to #4 Order filed by Jogaak Deng Jogaak. (SLW) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRECEIVED Minnehaha County Criminal Case #16-4825. Record is on Clerk of Courts N drive. (SLW) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mail sent to Jogaak Jogaak was returned as undeliverable. #4 Order was returned. Resent to same address. Petitioner confirmed via t/c it was the correct address. (SLW) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER directing service and ordering parties to show cause by March 12, 2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 2/12/2021. (CG) EMAILED to 2254 Service Email group per Service Agreement and MAILED to Mr. Jogaak on 2/12/2021 (SAC). (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 together with the filing fee. A new case has opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SLW) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 ($5 fee paid, receipt# SDX400053952). (Attachments: #1 Minnehaha County Docs) (SLW) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less