This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:06:29 (UTC).

Joffrion v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Joffrion filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sanofi US Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Michael North. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14094

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marie Joffrion

Defendants

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Sun Pharma Global FZE

Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Hospira, Inc.

Pfizer Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Accord Healthcare, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sandoz Inc.

Hospira Worldwide, LLC

Sandoz, Inc.

Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jere Kyle Bachus

Attorney at Bachus & Schanker, LLC (Denver)

1899 Wynkoop Street, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80202

John Christopher Elliott

Attorney at Bachus & Schanker, LLC (Denver)

1899 Wynkoop Street, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80202

Darin Lee Schanker

Attorney at Bachus & Schanker, LLC (Denver)

1899 Wynkoop Street, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL with prejudice by Marie Joffrion. This Notice shall not affect the lawsuit filed by Marie Joffrion which is currently pending in MDL No. 2740 in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana, bearing case number 17-cv-14464. (Filed per Rec. Doc. 9043 in 16-MD-2740)(ecm) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#4

(#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT by Marie Joffrion. (Schanker, Darin) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#3

(#3) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8009791) filed by Marie Joffrion.Attorney Jere Kyle Bachus added to party Marie Joffrion(pty:pla).(Bachus, Jere) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL with prejudice by Marie Joffrion. This Notice shall not affect the lawsuit filed by Marie Joffrion which is currently pending in MDL No. 2740 in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana, bearing case number 17-cv-14464. (Filed per Rec. Doc. 9043 in 16-MD-2740)(ecm) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT by Marie Joffrion. (Schanker, Darin) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8009791) filed by Marie Joffrion.Attorney Jere Kyle Bachus added to party Marie Joffrion(pty:pla).(Bachus, Jere) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.