This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2021 at 09:36:39 (UTC).

Joffe v. Verizon Communications, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Joffe filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Verizon Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02315

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven L. Joffe

Towson, MD 21204

Defendant

Verizon Communications, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

(#3) Intent to have a Court Reporter present during all phases of action by Steven L. Joffe. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit completed summons for Clerk to issue and return to Plaintiff to effectuate service; denying #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/22/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m w/blank summons 9/22/21) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to Verizon Communications, Inc. (c/m to Plaintiff 10/5/21)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#6

(#6) Plaintiff's Acknowledgement and RESPONSE to #4 Order of this Court issued September 22, 2021, filed by Steven L. Joffe.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#7

(#7) Correspondence received from Steven L. Joffe re: Modification of Civil Case. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Correspondence received from Steven L. Joffe re: Modification of Civil Case. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's Acknowledgement and RESPONSE to #4 Order of this Court issued September 22, 2021, filed by Steven L. Joffe.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to Verizon Communications, Inc. (c/m to Plaintiff 10/5/21)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit completed summons for Clerk to issue and return to Plaintiff to effectuate service; denying #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/22/2021. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m w/blank summons 9/22/21) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 14637129652 (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Intent to have a Court Reporter present during all phases of action by Steven L. Joffe. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Steven L. Joffe. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Verizon Communications, Inc., filed by Steven L. Joffe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Verizon Communications Inc. is a litigant