This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2020 at 08:54:46 (UTC).

Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Schatz et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Joe Hand Promotions, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Schatz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kari A. Dooley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01041

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kari A. Dooley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.

Defendants

Kevin Schatz individually, and as an officer, director, shareholder, member and/or principal of 49 High St LL d/b/a Blarneys Cafe

49 High St LLC doing business as Blarney's Cafe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Lincoln Chambers, Jr

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Chambers Jr.

100 Wells St., Suite 2C

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Affidavit

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. 49 High St LLC served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; Kevin Schatz served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Chambers, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Chambers, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#7

(#7) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *49 High St LLC, Kevin Schatz* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Lincoln Chambers, Jr* *Law Office of Michael Chambers Jr.* *Bushnell on the Park 100 Wells St., Suite 2C* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/23/2020. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/23/2020. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2020 Discovery due by 1/22/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2021 Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 49 High St LLC, Kevin Schatz ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5992143.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chambers, Michael) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. 49 High St LLC served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; Kevin Schatz served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Chambers, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Chambers, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *49 High St LLC, Kevin Schatz* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Lincoln Chambers, Jr* *Law Office of Michael Chambers Jr.* *Bushnell on the Park 100 Wells St., Suite 2C* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/23/2020. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/23/2020. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2020 Discovery due by 1/22/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2021 Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketJudge Kari A. Dooley added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to 49 High St LLC, Kevin Schatz. (Chambers, Michael) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 49 High St LLC, Kevin Schatz ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5992143.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chambers, Michael) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less