This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2019 at 07:48:45 (UTC).

Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Patel et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 Joe Hand Promotions, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Patel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor A. Bolden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00797

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor A. Bolden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.

Defendants

Vanitaben Patel

Rajchandra LLC

Shashikant Patel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wayne D. Lonstein

Attorney at Lonstein Law Office, P.C.

190 South Main St., P.O. Box 351

Ellenville, NY 12428

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., #1 Complaint, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., #6 Standing Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#6

(#6) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2019. Discovery due by 11/22/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/27/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Shashikant Patel served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#8

(#8) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint & Exhibits) (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

1 #4

Supplement as to Deft., Rajchandra LLC

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Rajchandra LLC served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Shashikant Patel, Vanitaben Patel, Rajchandra LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5291752.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement as to Deft., Shashikant Patel, #3 Supplement as to Deft., Vanitaben Patel, #4 Supplement as to Deft., Rajchandra LLC)(Lonstein, Wayne) Modified on 5/23/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 05/23/2019)

1 #1

Supplement Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Supplement as to Deft., Vanitaben Patel

8 #1

Complaint & Exhibits

#9

(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Shashikant Patel, Vanitaben Patel, Rajchandra LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Wayne D. Lonstein* *190 South Main St.* *P.O. Box 351* *Ellenville, NY 12428*. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

1 #2

Supplement as to Deft., Shashikant Patel

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Shashikant Patel served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Rajchandra LLC served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Vanitaben Patel served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Shashikant Patel, Vanitaben Patel, Rajchandra LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Wayne D. Lonstein* *190 South Main St.* *P.O. Box 351* *Ellenville, NY 12428*. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Rajchandra LLC. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Vanitaben Patel. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Shashikant Patel. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint & Exhibits) (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., #1 Complaint, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., #6 Standing Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2019. Discovery due by 11/22/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/27/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lonstein, Wayne) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Shashikant Patel, Vanitaben Patel, Rajchandra LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5291752.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement as to Deft., Shashikant Patel, #3 Supplement as to Deft., Vanitaben Patel, #4 Supplement as to Deft., Rajchandra LLC)(Lonstein, Wayne) Modified on 5/23/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.