This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:19:24 (UTC).

JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. KIM et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against KIM. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00188

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.

Defendants

GENESIS BUSINESS SYSTEMS, LLC doing business as Gangnam Korean BBQ

SARAH YING AL KIM

JOSEPH J. KIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark D. Janis

Attorney at BARNES & THORNBURG

11 S Meridian St, Suite 1313

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Ryan R. Janis

Attorney at JEKIELEK & JANIS LLP

203 E. Pennsylvania Blvd.

Feasterville, PA 19053

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Affidavit

7 #1

Affidavit

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Joseph J. Kim, Sarah Ying Ai Kim, and Genesis Business Systems, LLC on 10/06/2020, filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Janis, Ryan) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to GENESIS BUSINESS SYSTEMS, LLC, JOSEPH J. KIM, SARAH YING AL KIM. (JRB) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

5 #1

Complaint

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that Ryan R. Janis, Esq. register as a user of the courts electronic case filing system by September 1, 2020. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. PLEASE NOTE CHANGES TO PROPOSED ORDER. Copy to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/18/2020. (AAS) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

2 #2

Envelope

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GENESIS BUSINESS SYSTEMS, LLC, JOSEPH J. KIM, SARAH YING AL KIM, filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP070349) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope). (AKH) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Joseph J. Kim, Sarah Ying Ai Kim, and Genesis Business Systems, LLC on 10/06/2020, filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Janis, Ryan) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to GENESIS BUSINESS SYSTEMS, LLC, JOSEPH J. KIM, SARAH YING AL KIM. (JRB) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that Ryan R. Janis, Esq. register as a user of the courts electronic case filing system by September 1, 2020. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. PLEASE NOTE CHANGES TO PROPOSED ORDER. Copy to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/18/2020. (AAS) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Attorney(s) Ryan R. Janis to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP070349) filed by Plaintiff JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(AKH) Modified on 8/17/2020 (AKH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2020: #2 Envelope) (AKH). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GENESIS BUSINESS SYSTEMS, LLC, JOSEPH J. KIM, SARAH YING AL KIM, filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP070349) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope). (AKH) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less