This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/20/2022 at 07:33:14 (UTC).

Joe-Geo Properties L L C v. Scottsdale Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Joe-Geo Properties L L C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01343

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe-Geo Properties L L C

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hannah Elizabeth Mayeaux

Attorney at Townsley Law Firm

3102 Enterprise Blvd

Lake Charles, LA 70601

David Harmon Hanchey

Attorney at Townsley Law Firm

3102 Enterprise Blvd

Lake Charles, LA 70601

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Scottsdale Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5110185) filed by Joe-Geo Properties L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Hannah Elizabeth Mayeaux added to party Joe-Geo Properties L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Mayeaux, Hannah) Modified docket text on 5/19/2022 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 05/19/2022)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scottsdale Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Hannah Elizabeth Mayeaux on behalf of Joe-Geo Properties L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/2/2022. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Hannah Elizabeth Mayeaux on behalf of Joe-Geo Properties L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/2/2022. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scottsdale Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Scottsdale Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5110185) filed by Joe-Geo Properties L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Hannah Elizabeth Mayeaux added to party Joe-Geo Properties L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Mayeaux, Hannah) Modified docket text on 5/19/2022 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannah Elizabeth Mayeaux

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Harmon Hanchey