Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2021 at 11:53:54 (UTC).

Joachain v. M-I L L C et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Joachain filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against M-I L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00856

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Joachain

Defendants

Schlumberger Technology Corp

M-I L L C d/b/a M-I SWACO

M-I Swaco

XYZ Tank Cleaning Company

M-I L L C doing business as M-I Swaco

X Y Z Tank Cleaning Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chuck D Granger

Attorney at Granger Law Firm

P O Drawer 1849

Opelousas, LA 70571

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Wesley Capell

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (LAF)

P O Box 52008 O C S

Lafayette, LA 70505

David W Leefe

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (NO)

701 Poydras St Ste 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Attachments to scheduling order

#6

(#6) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2021 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#5

(#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 4/1/2021. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/31/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by M-I L L C, Schlumberger Technology Corp identifying Corporate Parent Schlumberger Ltd for M-I L L C, Schlumberger Technology Corp. (aty,Capell, Brian) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

1 #10

Exhibit D

1 #9

Exhibit C

1 #8

Exhibit B

1 #7

Exhibit A

1 #6

Notice of State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #5

Certificate of Notice

1 #4

Notice of Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel

1 #3

Roster of Attorneys

1 #2

Notice of Filing and Certificate of Removing Defendants

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 38th JDC Cameron Parish, Case Number 10-20593 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4624682) filed by Schlumberger Technology Corp, M-I L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing and Certificate of Removing Defendants, #3 Roster of Attorneys, #4 Notice of Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel, #5 Certificate of Notice, #6 Notice of State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D)(Attorney Brian Wesley Capell added to party M-I L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Wesley Capell added to party Schlumberger Technology Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Capell, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2021 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 4/1/2021. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/31/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by M-I L L C, Schlumberger Technology Corp.(aty,Capell, Brian) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by M-I L L C, Schlumberger Technology Corp identifying Corporate Parent Schlumberger Ltd for M-I L L C, Schlumberger Technology Corp. (aty,Capell, Brian) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed in the 38th JDC, Parish of Cameron. M-I L L C answer due 4/6/2021; Schlumberger Technology Corp answer due 4/6/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in attachment #8 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 38th JDC Cameron Parish, Case Number 10-20593 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4624682) filed by Schlumberger Technology Corp, M-I L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing and Certificate of Removing Defendants, #3 Roster of Attorneys, #4 Notice of Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel, #5 Certificate of Notice, #6 Notice of State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D)(Attorney Brian Wesley Capell added to party M-I L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Wesley Capell added to party Schlumberger Technology Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Capell, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3M COMPANY doing business as USA 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where M-I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Schlumberger Technology Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chuck D Granger