This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2020 at 12:51:04 (UTC).

J.M.W. v. WALSH

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 J M W filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALSH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kim R. Gibson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kim R. Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J.M.W.

Defendant

MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Lynn Ducote

Attorney at Richard Ducote, Attorney & Counselor at Law, APLC

318 East Boston Street, Second Floor

Covington, LA 70433

Defendant Attorneys

Toby D. McIlwain

Attorney at Spence, Custer, Saylor, Wolfe & Rose, LLC

1067 Menoher Boulevard

Johnstown, PA 15905

Ronald P. Carnevali, Jr.

Attorney at Spence, Custer, Saylor, Wolfe & Rose

1067 Menoher Boulevard

Johnstown, PA 15905

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mcintyre, Victoria) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH. (Carnevali, Ronald) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#12

(#12) Proposed Initial Scheduling Order by MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH. (Carnevali, Ronald) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#11

(#11) BRIEF in Opposition re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by J.M.W.. (Mcintyre, Victoria) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

10 #3

Exhibit "C" - Initial Scheduling Order

10 #2

Exhibit "B" - Fed.R.Civ.P. 26 (f) Report

10 #1

Exhibit "A" - Stipulation Selecting ADR Process

#10

(#10) ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and 16.2, an Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference shall be held TELEPHONICALLY on 7/16/2020, at 10:00 a.m. It is the responsibility of counsel to coordinate the call to the Judge's Chambers, and as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Stipulation Selecting ADR Process, #2 Exhibit "B" - Fed.R.Civ.P. 26 (f) Report, #3 Exhibit "C" - Initial Scheduling Order) (dlg) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) BRIEF in Support re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Carnevali, Ronald) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint by MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Carnevali, Ronald) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Toby D. McIlwain on behalf of MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH. (McIlwain, Toby) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald P. Carnevali, Jr on behalf of MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH. (Carnevali, Ronald) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5619672), filed by J.M.W. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summons) (ma) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 7/22/2020 is RESCHEDULED to 7/23/2020, at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Kim R. Gibson. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (dlg) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Case Management Conference scheduled for 7/16/2020 is RESCHEDULED to 7/22/2020, at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Kim R. Gibson. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (dlg) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #13 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. ERROR: Outdated form. CORRECTION: Counsel is advised the Stipulation Selecting ADR form has been updated. Dispose of all previous versions of the Stipulation and begin using the amended form, with the revision date 4/2017. This message is for informational purposes only. (ma) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mcintyre, Victoria) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH. (Carnevali, Ronald) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Proposed Initial Scheduling Order by MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH. (Carnevali, Ronald) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEF in Opposition re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by J.M.W.. (Mcintyre, Victoria) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and 16.2, an Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference shall be held TELEPHONICALLY on 7/16/2020, at 10:00 a.m. It is the responsibility of counsel to coordinate the call to the Judge's Chambers, and as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Stipulation Selecting ADR Process, #2 Exhibit "B" - Fed.R.Civ.P. 26 (f) Report, #3 Exhibit "C" - Initial Scheduling Order) (dlg) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEF in Support re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Carnevali, Ronald) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint by MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Carnevali, Ronald) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Toby D. McIlwain on behalf of MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH. (McIlwain, Toby) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald P. Carnevali, Jr on behalf of MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH. (Carnevali, Ronald) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal Document and the fully redacted Ex. A attached to the instant motion shall be substituted in the public record for Document 1-2, which shall now be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 5/21/2020. (dlg) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint Doc. 1-2 [Ex A] only & Substitute by J.M.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New Redacted Ex. A, #2 Proposed Order to Substitute & Seal) (Ducote, Richard) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH (ma) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MICHAEL THOMAS WALSH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5619672), filed by J.M.W. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summons) (ma) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less