This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2021 at 09:16:49 (UTC).

JLPR v. Utah Department of Agriculture and Food et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 JLPR filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Utah Department of Agriculture and Food. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ted Stewart and Daphne A. Oberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00436

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ted Stewart

Referral Judge

Daphne A. Oberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JLPR

Defendants

Utah Department of Agriculture and Food

Utah Division of Purchasing and General Services

State of Utah, The

Scott Ericson

Kerry Gibson

Kelly Pehrson

Andrew Rigby

Cody James

Natalie Callahan

Mellissa Ure

Brandy Grace

Christopher W. Hughes

Mark Anderson

Zac Christensen

Stephanie Casta

Standard Wellness Utah

True North of Utah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason M. Kerr

Attorney at PRICE PARKINSON & KERR PLLC

5742 W Harold Gatty Dr Ste 101

Salt Lake City, UT 84116

Steven Garff

5742 W Harold Gatty Dr

Salt Lake City, UT 84116

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley W. Bowen

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Leo J. Hurley, Jr.

Attorney at CONNELL FOLEY

185 Hudson St Ste 2510

Jersey City, NJ 07311

Reid W. Lambert

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Mark O. Morris

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP

15 W South Temple Ste 1200, Gateway Tower West

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Leo J. Hurley, Jr.

12 #1

Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission

#12

#11

#10

#9

#7

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order Extending time to respond

#6

#5

#4

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Leo J. Hurley, Jr for Standard Wellness Utah.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 09/09/2021. (jl) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leo J. Hurley, Jr. , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4105284,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Standard Wellness Utah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Leo J. Hurley, Jr.)(Lambert, Reid) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley W. Bowen on behalf of Standard Wellness Utah (Bowen, Bradley) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Reid W. Lambert on behalf of Standard Wellness Utah (Lambert, Reid) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendant True North, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by True North of Utah re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support (Morris, Mark) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #6 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the motion to dismiss is extended to September 16, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/31/2021. No attached document. (eh) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT (FIRST) AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4097775) filed by JLPR. Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Kerr, Jason) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time respond to motion to dismiss filed by Plaintiff JLPR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending time to respond) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Garff, Steven) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant True North of Utah. Attorney Mark O. Morris added to party True North of Utah(pty:dft)(Morris, Mark) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/21/21. (jwt) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/20/2021. (tlc) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4060998) filed by JLPR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Kerr, Jason) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiff JLPR is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEO J. HURLEY, JR.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark O. Morris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reid W. Lambert