This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2020 at 09:36:51 (UTC).

JLD Properties of St. Albans, LLC v. Patriot Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 JLD Properties of St Albans, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Patriot Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christina Reiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00134

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina Reiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JLD Properties of St. Albans, LLC

Defendant

Patriot Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.

Attorney at Gravel & Shea PC

76 St. Paul Street, 7Th Floor, P.O. Box 369

Burlington, VT 05402-0369

Defendant Attorney

John E. Brady, Esq.

Attorney at Brady Donahue

56 Main Street, Suite 303, P.O. Box 39

Springfield, VT 05156-0039

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

#4

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

4 #2

Document Removed

4 #3

Exhibit A

4 #4

Exhibit B

#5

#6

#7

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce to Defendant Patriot Insurance Company by JLD Properties of St. Albans, LLC.(Byrne, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Patriot Insurance Company (Brady, John) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Patriot Insurance Company. Exhibit A has been replaced to remove duplicative pdf headers. The corrected document is now attached to #4 as well as this entry. NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL re: #4 . The attached Corporate Disclosure Statement has been removed. Document must be filed as its own filing on the docket. (jlh) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Patriot Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A #4 Exhibit B)(Brady, John) Attachment 2 removed on 10/16/2020 (jlh). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/16/2020) (jlh). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/16/2020) (jlh). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION Regarding Acceptance of Service and Response to Complaint re #1 Complaint by JLD Properties of St. Albans, LLC (Byrne, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John E. Brady, Esq on behalf of Patriot Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brady, John) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Patriot Insurance Company filed by JLD Properties of St. Albans, LLC.Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kp) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Patriot Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew B. Byrne