This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2021 at 06:55:29 (UTC).

Jitendra Sawant et al v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 Jitendra Sawant filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against US Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb, Kenly Kiya Kato, John A. Kronstadt and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00211

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

Presiding Judges

John W. Holcomb

John A. Kronstadt

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL

ROHIT SISAUDIA

SASHI PRABHA SAVALA

CHRISTINA HU

DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI

RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI

RAJANI CHAGANTI

HAREESHA MUPPALANENI

AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI

NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL

NAMRABI BARAUH

PRASANTHI COTLA

MANVI SOLANKI

DIVYA VEGIRAJU

RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA

SHAGUN SOOD

LALITHA KATEPALLY

NALINI VIDYA VELLURI

ANKANA HALDAR

DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI

96 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bernard P Wolfsdorf

Attorney at Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP

1416 2Nd Street

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Jonathan D. Wasden

Attorney at Wasden Banias LLC

38 Romney Street Suite 201

Charleston, SC 29403

Rahula Venkat Reddy

Attorney at Reddy and Neumann PC

11000 Richmond Avenue Suite 600

Houston, TX 77042

Other Attorneys

OIL-DCS Trial Attorney

Attorney at Office of Immigration Litigation

Po Box 868 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

David E Pinchas

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#60

(#60) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION FOR 60 DAYS #57 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. This case is stayed through November 3, 2021. (hr) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#59

(#59) ORDER DISMISSING MOOT CLAIMS AND TRANSFERRING CLAIMS PENDING ADJUDICATION IN THE TEXAS SERVICE CENTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The claims of plaintiffs Prabha Blaji Kalyanam, Pavan Kumar Modali and Sirisha Sreekanth are hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. The claims of Plaintiffs FNU Bhuvaneshwari and Smitha Rackshit will remain in the above action in the Central District of California and counsel for Defendant shall file a response to First Amended Complaint not later than September 9, 2021. (see document for further details) (hr) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#58

RESTRICTED

#56

RESTRICTED

#55

(#55) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #54 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Plaintiffs shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment on or before September 14, 2021. (hr) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#53

(#53) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #47 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Plaintiffs shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment on or before September 2, 2021. (hr) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#61) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Northern District of Texas, 3:21-cv-02163 filed 9/10/2021. (iv) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION FOR 60 DAYS #57 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. This case is stayed through November 3, 2021. (hr) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER DISMISSING MOOT CLAIMS AND TRANSFERRING CLAIMS PENDING ADJUDICATION IN THE TEXAS SERVICE CENTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The claims of plaintiffs Prabha Blaji Kalyanam, Pavan Kumar Modali and Sirisha Sreekanth are hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. The claims of Plaintiffs FNU Bhuvaneshwari and Smitha Rackshit will remain in the above action in the Central District of California and counsel for Defendant shall file a response to First Amended Complaint not later than September 9, 2021. (see document for further details) (hr) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Lodging #56 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is (See Other). Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Events Other Filings Notices Non-Opposition to Document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (et) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) STIPULATION to Stay Case filed by PLAINTIFF MOHANA NAG ACHA, LAKSHMI NIHARIKA ADDEPALLI, SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, JHANSI REDDY ANNAPUREDDY, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, SUMADEEPTHI BANDAPALLI, NAMRABI BARAUH, SATISH SWATHI BELLAVI, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, CHANDANA BONDU, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, VANDANA CHENNURU, NAGA BHARATH CHILUKURI, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, MANGESH MAROTRAO GADE, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SURABHI GAWANDE, KALYANI GEDELA, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, APARNA GOURISETTY, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, NAMITA MOHAN INAMDAR, SADHVI ISANAKA, JYOTSNA JAISANKAR, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, NIVYA JOHNY, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, PRABHA BALAJI KALYANAM, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, AMRITA KAPAT, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, HARSHA DEVI KORUKONDA, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, SUMANGALI SHANTAJE KRISHNABHAT, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANUSHA SINGH MAHETH, ALARMELU PICHU MANI, ANNU MEHTA, PAVAN KUMAR MODALI, DIVYA P MOTHE, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, SHWETHA RAMESH NAIK, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, APEKSHA MAHESH PATHAK, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, MASTHAN REDDY PIDAPARTHI, KEERTHI PUDOTA, SANDHYA RAKESH, SMITHA RAKSHIT, SURYA RAMAASAMY RAMASAMY, JYOTI RAMNANI, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, YAMINI SAMUDRALA, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, DIVYA SEKARAN, JEYAPRIYA SESHADRI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, ANUSHI SHRIVASTAVA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MAYURI RAMNIKLAL SODHA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, SIRISHA SREEKANTH, MITAL DINESH THAKKAR, KAMLESH SINGH THAKUR, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, ISHA TYAGI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, BHAVYA VEMURI, SUCHITRA VIJAYARAGHAVAN, SWETHA VONTEDDU, PRIYA VYAS, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI, NAVYA YARLAGADDA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reddy, Rahula) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re No Opposition to Proposed Order re Notice of Lodging, #46 (Reddy, Rahula) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #54 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Plaintiffs shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment on or before September 14, 2021. (hr) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff MOHANA NAG ACHA, LAKSHMI NIHARIKA ADDEPALLI, SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, JHANSI REDDY ANNAPUREDDY, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, SUMADEEPTHI BANDAPALLI, NAMRABI BARAUH, SATISH SWATHI BELLAVI, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, CHANDANA BONDU, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, VANDANA CHENNURU, NAGA BHARATH CHILUKURI, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, MANGESH MAROTRAO GADE, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SURABHI GAWANDE, KALYANI GEDELA, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, APARNA GOURISETTY, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, NAMITA MOHAN INAMDAR, SADHVI ISANAKA, JYOTSNA JAISANKAR, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, NIVYA JOHNY, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, PRABHA BALAJI KALYANAM, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, AMRITA KAPAT, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, HARSHA DEVI KORUKONDA, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, SUMANGALI SHANTAJE KRISHNABHAT, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANUSHA SINGH MAHETH, ALARMELU PICHU MANI, ANNU MEHTA, PAVAN KUMAR MODALI, DIVYA P MOTHE, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, SHWETHA RAMESH NAIK, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, APEKSHA MAHESH PATHAK, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, MASTHAN REDDY PIDAPARTHI, KEERTHI PUDOTA, SANDHYA RAKESH, SMITHA RAKSHIT, SURYA RAMAASAMY RAMASAMY, JYOTI RAMNANI, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, YAMINI SAMUDRALA, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, DIVYA SEKARAN, JEYAPRIYA SESHADRI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, ANUSHI SHRIVASTAVA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MAYURI RAMNIKLAL SODHA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, SIRISHA SREEKANTH, MITAL DINESH THAKKAR, KAMLESH SINGH THAKUR, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, ISHA TYAGI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, BHAVYA VEMURI, SUCHITRA VIJAYARAGHAVAN, SWETHA VONTEDDU, PRIYA VYAS, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI, NAVYA YARLAGADDA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reddy, Rahula) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #47 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Plaintiffs shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment on or before September 2, 2021. (hr) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND/CORRECT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #50 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (hr) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. No Judge's initials next to case number. The names must be exactly as how it is on the complaint. Defendants name does not match or incomplete. See summons caption. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff MOHANA NAG ACHA, SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, NAMRABI BARAUH, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, MANGESH MAROTRAO GADE, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, SADHVI ISANAKA, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANNU MEHTA, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, KEERTHI PUDOTA, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, SWETHA VONTEDDU, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix)(Reddy, Rahula) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Wasden. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff MOHANA NAG ACHA, SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, NAMRABI BARAUH, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, SADHVI ISANAKA, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANNU MEHTA, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, KEERTHI PUDOTA, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, SWETHA VONTEDDU, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-00481 (Reddy, Rahula) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,,,,, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,,,,, #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, NAMRABI BARAUH, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, SADHVI ISANAKA, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANNU MEHTA, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, KEERTHI PUDOTA, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, SWETHA VONTEDDU, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI. (Attachments: #1 Appendix USAG, #2 Appendix DHS GC)(Reddy, Rahula) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MOHANA NAG ACHA, SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, NAMRABI BARAUH, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, SADHVI ISANAKA, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANNU MEHTA, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, KEERTHI PUDOTA, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, SWETHA VONTEDDU, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI, identifying None. (Reddy, Rahula) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs MOHANA NAG ACHA, SWETA ALLADA, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, SWATHY ARUKALA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, NAMRABI BARAUH, ANSHUL BHATIA, SUYANY BHAVANAM, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, RAJANI CHAGANTI, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, PRASANTHI COTLA, APARNA DEODHAR, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, JYOTHI GANTA, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, ANKANA HALDAR, CHRISTINA HU, SADHVI ISANAKA, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, JINCY JESTINE, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, LALITHA KATEPALLY, SWATHI KODIMYALA, DIVYATA KOHLI, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SHWETA LADDHA, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, ANNU MEHTA, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, VARHSABEN PATEL, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, KEERTHI PUDOTA, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, JITENDRA SAWANT, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, AMRITA SHARMA, ANJALI SHARMA, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, ROHIT SISAUDIA, MANVI SOLANKI, SHAGUN SOOD, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, SUSMITHA TOODI, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, SWETHA VONTEDDU, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI. (Reddy, Rahula) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30423730 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM, VARHSABEN PATEL, SUSMITHA TOODI, ELLA JOSHI, ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL, SWETHA GINJUPALLI, SHWETA LADDHA, JYOTHI GANTA, JINCY JESTINE, SUNEETI CHAUDHARY, AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI, NAVYA REDDY LENKALA, AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN, TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL, RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI, PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM, JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL, ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL, MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN, SHILPA RAYAKOTA, GURU CHALICHEEMALA, SATARUPA BORKOTOKY, SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI, NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU, ROHIT SISAUDIA, VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR, SHAGUN SOOD, DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI, RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI, CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO, CHRISTINA HU, HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL, ANNU MEHTA, NALINI VIDYA VELLURI, DIVYATA KOHLI, NAMRABI BARAUH, SADHVI ISANAKA, AMRITA SHARMA, KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN, SWETHA VONTEDDU, SASHI PRABHA SAVALA, SWETA ALLADA, POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA, VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI, JITENDRA SAWANT, PRAVEENA PAIDALA, SWATHI KODIMYALA, VARSHA MANSING NEVASE, MANVI SOLANKI, DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE, PRASANTHI COTLA, ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO, RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA, LALITHA KATEPALLY, VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI, DIVYA VEGIRAJU, RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA, ANSHUL BHATIA, ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL, SWATHY ARUKALA, RAJANI CHAGANTI, FNU BHUVANESHWARI, NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL, ANKANA HALDAR, HAREESHA MUPPALANENI, SUYANY BHAVANAM, MOHANA NAG ACHA, ANJALI SHARMA, APARNA DEODHAR, KEERTHI PUDOTA, SANDHYA SEELAMNENI, DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI, PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B-6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B-7) (Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party MOHANA NAG ACHA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SWETA ALLADA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party AIKYA REDDY ANKENAPALLI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SWATHY ARUKALA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party POOJA MYSORE BALACHANDRA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party NAMRABI BARAUH(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party ANSHUL BHATIA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SUYANY BHAVANAM(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party FNU BHUVANESHWARI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SATARUPA BORKOTOKY(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party CHRISTABEL ANN BRITTO(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party RAJANI CHAGANTI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party GURU CHALICHEEMALA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party RAGINI CHALLAGOLLA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SUNEETI CHAUDHARY(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party PRASANTHI COTLA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party APARNA DEODHAR(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party VIJAYALAKSHMI PRIYADARSHINI DUDDUMPUDI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party JYOTHI GANTA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party RAMA KRISHNA HARI GARIKIPATI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SWETHA GINJUPALLI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party ANKANA HALDAR(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party CHRISTINA HU(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SADHVI ISANAKA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party JEYASHRI JANAKI JAWAHARLAL(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party JINCY JESTINE(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party ELLA JOSHI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party ASHALEKSHMI JANARDANA KAIMAL(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party RADHIKA KANDRAKONDA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party ANNIEMERLIN KANTHAVEL(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party LALITHA KATEPALLY(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SWATHI KODIMYALA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party DIVYATA KOHLI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party VALLIKRISHNA KOTHAPALLI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party KAYALVIZHI KULANDAIVELUPANDIAN(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SHWETA LADDHA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party NAVYA REDDY LENKALA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party ANNU MEHTA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party HAREESHA MUPPALANENI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party RAGHUNATH NAGEPALLI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party DEEPTHI NANNAPANENI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party VARSHA MANSING NEVASE(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party NAGA SRAVANTHI NIDUMOLU(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party PADMASINI HASSAN PADMAPRABHU(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party PRAVEENA PAIDALA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party MAHALAKSHMI PANDIAN(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party ASHAKUMARI NIRAV PATEL(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party VARHSABEN PATEL(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party TRUPTI CHANDRASHEKAR PATIL(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party VENKATA GOPALAMMA PHANIHARAM(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party KEERTHI PUDOTA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party ANJALI PADAMANNUR RAO(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party HARDIK MANOJKUMAR RAVAL(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party AISHWARYA MANICKA RAVICHANDRAN(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SHILPA RAYAKOTA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party NIRMALA SAKTHIVEL SAKTHIVEL(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SASHI PRABHA SAVALA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party JITENDRA SAWANT(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SANDHYA SEELAMNENI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party AMRITA SHARMA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party ANJALI SHARMA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party DEVARAJU ASHA SHWETHASHREE(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party ROHIT SISAUDIA(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party MANVI SOLANKI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SHAGUN SOOD(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party PRITHVIRAM RUTHRAVELU THULARAM(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SUSMITHA TOODI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party VIJAYALAKSHMI UDAYAKUMAR(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SRINIVASAVI VEERANKI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party DIVYA VEGIRAJU(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party NALINI VIDYA VELLURI(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party SWETHA VONTEDDU(pty:pla), Attorney Rahula Venkat Reddy added to party DIVYA ANANDA YALGOORI(pty:pla))(Reddy, Rahula) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David E Pinchas