This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 08:17:04 (UTC).

Jiron v. Valencia County Board of County Commissioners et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Jiron filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Valencia County Board of County Commissioners. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Robbenhaar and Kevin R. Sweazea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01213

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

Referral Judge

Kevin R. Sweazea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lucas Jiron

Defendants

Valencia County Board of County Commissioners

Danny Monette

Randy Gutierrez

Ramon Lozano

Sebastian Alvarez

Gerald Espinoza

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Taylor Smith

Attorney at Garrett Law

6739 Academy Road, Nesuite 350

Albuquerque, NM 87120

Defendant Attorney

Jonlyn M Martinez

Attorney at Law Firm of Jonlyn M. Martinez

P O Box 1805105 14Th St. Sw

Albuquerque, NM 87103-1805

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit State Court Filings

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sebastian Alvarez, Gerald Espinoza, Randy Gutierrez, Ramon Lozano, Danny Monette, Valencia County Board of County Commissioners. (Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by March 7, 2022. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for March 15, 2022 at 10:30 AM. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than February 17, 2022. (atc) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by March 7, 2022. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for March 15, 2022 at 10:30 AM. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than February 17, 2022. (atc) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sebastian Alvarez, Gerald Espinoza, Randy Gutierrez, Ramon Lozano, Danny Monette, Valencia County Board of County Commissioners. (Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (dr) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8046274 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Danny Monette, Sebastian Alvarez, Ramon Lozano, Randy Gutierrez, Gerald Espinoza, Valencia County Board of County Commissioners (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1314-CV-2021-00889. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Filings)(Martinez, Jonlyn) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonlyn M Martinez