This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2021 at 09:18:51 (UTC).

JINES et al v. THE DEVEREUX FOUNDATION et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 JINES filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE DEVEREUX FOUNDATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is ANITA B. BRODY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00346

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANITA B. BRODY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN DOE 1

JANE DOE 1

JANE DOE 3

KATHERINE JINES

JANE DOE 2

JOHN DOE 2

Defendants

THE DEVEREUX FOUNDATION doing business as DEVEREUX ADVANCED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH

QUALITYHEALTH STAFFING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOSEPH G. SAUDER

Attorney at Sauder Schelkopf LLC

1109 Lancaster Ave

Berwyn, PA 19312

MARK P. CHALOS

Attorney at LIEFF CABRASER HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN

222 - 2Nd Ave South Suite 1640

Nashville, TN 37201

LORI G. KIER

Attorney at SAUDER SCHELKOPF LLC

1109 Lancaster Ave

Berwyn, PA 19312

ANNIKA K. MARTIN

Attorney at LIEFF CABRASER HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN LLP

250 Hudson St 8Th Fl

New York, NY 10013

HANNAH LAZARZ

Attorney at LIEFF CABRASER HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN

222 - 2Nd Ave South Suite 1640

Nashville, TN 37201

Defendant Attorneys

COREY S.D. NORCROSS

Attorney at STRADLEY, RONON, STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP

2005 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JEFFREY A. LUTSKY

Attorney at STADLEY RONON STEVENS & YOUNG LLP

2600 One Commerce Sq

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOSEPH J. MCHALE

Attorney at STRADLEY RONON STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP

2005 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit 5

1 #6

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Hearing:A RULE 16 CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/20/2021 AT 02:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, ) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 3, KATHERINE JINES, JOHN DOE 1. QUALITYHEALTH STAFFING, LLC waiver sent on 2/8/2021, answer due 4/9/2021; THE DEVEREUX FOUNDATION waiver sent on 2/8/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (SAUDER, JOSEPH) Modified on 2/10/2021 (fb). (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMailed copy of summons to counsel on 2/8/2021. (md, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER THAT ANNIKA MARTIN APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 2/5/21. 2/5/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER THAT MARK CHALOS APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 2/5/21. 2/5/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT HANNAH LAZARZ APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice #6 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 2/5/21. 2/5/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Annika Martin by JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, KATHERINE JINES. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14896027.). (SAUDER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark Chalos by JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, KATHERINE JINES. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14895991.). (SAUDER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Lazarz by JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, KATHERINE JINES. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14895962.). (SAUDER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY A. LUTSKY on behalf of QUALITYHEALTH STAFFING, LLC, THE DEVEREUX FOUNDATION with Certificate of Service(LUTSKY, JEFFREY) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by COREY S.D. NORCROSS on behalf of QUALITYHEALTH STAFFING, LLC, THE DEVEREUX FOUNDATION with Certificate of Service(NORCROSS, COREY) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. MCHALE on behalf of QUALITYHEALTH STAFFING, LLC, THE DEVEREUX FOUNDATION with Certificate of Service(MCHALE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by LORI G. KIER on behalf of JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, KATHERINE JINES (KIER, LORI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to QUALITYHEALTH STAFFING, LLC, THE DEVEREUX FOUNDATION. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/27/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, KATHERINE JINES. (JL ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against QUALITYHEALTH STAFFING, LLC, THE DEVEREUX FOUNDATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14869461.), filed by JOHN DOE 2, KATHERINE JINES, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 1, JOHN DOE 1. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(SAUDER, JOSEPH) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/27/2021) (fb, ). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Devereux Foundation doing business as Devereux Advanced Behavioral Health is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LORI G. KIER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Annika K. Martin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark P. Chalos