This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 10:12:00 (UTC).

Jimenez v. Burberry Limited

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Jimenez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Burberry Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Jeremy D. Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01133

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Jeremy D. Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flor Jimenez

Defendant

Burberry Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thiago Merlini Coelho

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

Hayley Singer Grunvald

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton

12275 El Camino Real, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint to 9/10/2021 by Burberry Limited. Attorney Grunvald, Hayley Singer added. (Grunvald, Hayley) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Burberry Limited served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

4 #3

VDRP

4 #2

Consent Form

4 #1

Standing Order

#4

(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 10/28/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Burberry Limited* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thiago Merlini Coelho* *Wilshire Law Firm* *3055 Wilshire Blvd, 12th Fl* *Los Angeles, CA 90010*. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Flor Jimenez (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Burberry Limited by Flor Jimenez. Attorney Coelho, Thiago Merlini added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9671188) (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint to 9/10/2021 by Burberry Limited. Attorney Grunvald, Hayley Singer added. (Grunvald, Hayley) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Burberry Limited served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 10/28/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Burberry Limited* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thiago Merlini Coelho* *Wilshire Law Firm* *3055 Wilshire Blvd, 12th Fl* *Los Angeles, CA 90010*. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Flor Jimenez (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Burberry Limited by Flor Jimenez. Attorney Coelho, Thiago Merlini added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9671188) (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thiago M. Coelho