This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2021 at 08:51:30 (UTC).

JIMENEZ et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 JIMENEZ filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-62189

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELISSA JIMENEZ

CATALINA OCAMPO

Defendant

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Shub

Attorney at Shub Law Firm LLC

134 Kings Highway East, Second Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Defendant Attorney

Michael F. Buchanan

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler, LLP

1133 Avenue Of The America

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

10 #1

*Restricted*

10 #10

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#9

#8

7 #2

Certificate of Service

7 #1

[Proposed] Consent Order

7 #7

Main Document

#6

5 #1

[Proposed] Stipulation and Order

5 #5

Main Document

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2021. (jhy) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docket(#12) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:21cv13113 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 0:21-cv-62189-AHS Jimenez et al v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. on 10/22/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 0:21-md-03015-AHS. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docket(#11) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. (mc) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:21-cv-13113. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the USDC for the FLSD. (dm ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT ORDER that the time within which JJCI may answer is extended to and including 10/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/15/2021. (abr, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter from Michael F. Buchanan on behalf of all parties requesting extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Consent Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BUCHANAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER setting date for JJCI to respond to the Complaint until and including 9/17/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/26/2021. (abr, ) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Michael F. Buchanan on behalf of all parties requesting extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Stipulation and Order)(BUCHANAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL F. BUCHANAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (BUCHANAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by MELISSA JIMENEZ, CATALINA OCAMPO of Related Actions (SHUB, JONATHAN) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, ) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12590835) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MELISSA JIMENEZ, CATALINA OCAMPO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHUB, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael F. Buchanan