This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2019 at 05:34:37 (UTC).

Jimenez et al v. City of New Rochelle et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 Jimenez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of New Rochelle. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent L. Briccetti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-02525

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vincent L. Briccetti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amparo Jimenez

Francisco Jimenez

Defendants and Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Providers

Michael P. Velasco

Dwayne Jones

Michael Vaccaro

Matthew P. Velasco

Brian Fagan

Christopher Castiglia

Scott Wallach

Christopher Guglielmo

Sean Kane

City of New Rochelle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eugene M. Bellin

Richard A. Ashman

Defendant Attorneys

John Martin Murtagh, Jr

Denise M. Cossu

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Denise M. Cossu on behalf of Christopher Castiglia(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Castiglia(in His Official Capacity), City of New Rochelle, Brian Fagan(in His Official Capacity), Brian Fagan(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo(in His Official Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Individual Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Official Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Individual Capacity). (Cossu, Denise) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#17

(#17) LETTER MOTION for Conference (Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from JOHN M. MURTAGH dated 05/28/2019. Document filed by Christopher Castiglia(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Castiglia(in His Official Capacity), City of New Rochelle, Brian Fagan(in His Official Capacity), Brian Fagan(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo(in His Official Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Individual Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Official Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Individual Capacity).(Murtagh, John) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Martin Murtagh, Jr on behalf of Christopher Castiglia(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Castiglia(in His Official Capacity), City of New Rochelle, Brian Fagan(in His Official Capacity), Brian Fagan(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo(in His Official Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Individual Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Official Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Individual Capacity). (Murtagh, John) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#15

(#15) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Sean Kane(in His Official Capacity) served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; Sean Kane(in His Individual Capacity) served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Service was accepted by Angelina V. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez; Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#14

(#14) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Christopher Guglielmo(in His Official Capacity) served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; Christopher Guglielmo(in His Individual Capacity) served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Service was accepted by Angelina V. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez; Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Brian Fagan(in His Official Capacity) served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; Brian Fagan(in His Individual Capacity) served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Service was accepted by Angelina V. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez; Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. City of New Rochelle served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Service was accepted by Jamie R. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez; Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Scott Wallach(in His Official Capacity) served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019; Scott Wallach(in His Individual Capacity) served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. Service was accepted by Angelina Valencia. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez; Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Matthew P. Velasco(in His Individual Capacity) served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019; Matthew P. Velasco(in His Official Capacity) served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. Service was accepted by Angelina Valencia. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez; Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eugene M. Bellin on behalf of Amparo Jimenez, Francisco Jimenez. (Bellin, Eugene) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New Rochelle, Dwayne Jones, Christopher Guglielmo, Sean Kane, Brian Fagan, Michael Vaccaro, Scott Wallach, Matthew P. Velasco, Christopher Castiglia, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez, Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#1

Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint,,. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16538100, paid on 3/21/2019. (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER denying as moot #17 Letter Motion for Conference: Judge Briccetti's Individual Practices do not require a pre-motion conference for motions to dismiss. Thus, there is no need for a pre-motion conference on defendants' anticipated motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (del) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Denise M. Cossu on behalf of Christopher Castiglia(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Castiglia(in His Official Capacity), City of New Rochelle, Brian Fagan(in His Official Capacity), Brian Fagan(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo(in His Official Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Individual Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Official Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Individual Capacity). (Cossu, Denise) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) LETTER MOTION for Conference (Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from JOHN M. MURTAGH dated 05/28/2019. Document filed by Christopher Castiglia(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Castiglia(in His Official Capacity), City of New Rochelle, Brian Fagan(in His Official Capacity), Brian Fagan(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo(in His Official Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Individual Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Official Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Individual Capacity).(Murtagh, John) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Martin Murtagh, Jr on behalf of Christopher Castiglia(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Castiglia(in His Official Capacity), City of New Rochelle, Brian Fagan(in His Official Capacity), Brian Fagan(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo(in His Official Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Individual Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Official Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Individual Capacity). (Murtagh, John) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Sean Kane(in His Official Capacity) served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; Sean Kane(in His Individual Capacity) served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Service was accepted by Angelina V. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez; Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Christopher Guglielmo(in His Official Capacity) served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; Christopher Guglielmo(in His Individual Capacity) served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Service was accepted by Angelina V. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez; Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Brian Fagan(in His Official Capacity) served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019; Brian Fagan(in His Individual Capacity) served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Service was accepted by Angelina V. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez; Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. City of New Rochelle served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Service was accepted by Jamie R. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez; Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Scott Wallach(in His Official Capacity) served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019; Scott Wallach(in His Individual Capacity) served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. Service was accepted by Angelina Valencia. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez; Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Matthew P. Velasco(in His Individual Capacity) served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019; Matthew P. Velasco(in His Official Capacity) served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. Service was accepted by Angelina Valencia. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez; Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard A. Ashman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Christopher Guglielmo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard A. Ashman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Richard A. Ashman. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Michael P. Velasco; Michael P. Velasco. The party was added to the case in error. (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint,,. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16538100, paid on 3/21/2019. (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eugene M. Bellin on behalf of Amparo Jimenez, Francisco Jimenez. (Bellin, Eugene) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New Rochelle, Dwayne Jones, Christopher Guglielmo, Sean Kane, Brian Fagan, Michael Vaccaro, Scott Wallach, Matthew P. Velasco, Christopher Castiglia, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez, Francisco Jimenez. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Christopher Castiglia(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Castiglia(in His Official Capacity), City of New Rochelle, Brian Fagan(in His Official Capacity), Brian Fagan(in His Individual Capacity), Christopher Guglielmo, Christopher Guglielmo, Dwayne Jones(in His Individual Capacity), Dwayne Jones(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Official Capacity), Sean Kane(in His Individual Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Official Capacity), Michael Vaccaro(in His Individual Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Official Capacity), Scott Wallach(in His Individual Capacity), Matthew P. Velasco, Matthew P. Velasco. Document filed by Amparo Jimenez, Francisco Jimenez.(Ashman, Richard) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less