This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 17:29:25 (UTC).

Jillian Clarke v. Alcon Vision, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 Jillian Clarke filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Alcon Vision, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Suzanne H. Segal and Otis D. Wright, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07644

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Suzanne H. Segal

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jillian Clarke

Defendants

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Alcon Vision, LLC

Alcon Laboratories, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andranik Tsarukyan

Armen Zenjiryan

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy L Hix

Ashley Nicole Arnett

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 1/13/2020 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-07644 ODW(SSx). (rn) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation, re Declaration #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on September 4, 2019. (Hix, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation, identifying Alcon Vision, LLC f/k/a Alcon Laboratories, Inc., Ciba Vision, LLC and Alcon Laboratories, Inc. f/k/a Alcon US Holdings Corporation. (Hix, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Hix, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Sondra Davis re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Hix, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Hix, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit 4 Answer to Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit 3 Verdicts

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Verdict Summaries

1 #1

Exhibit 1 Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV27356 with filing fee previously paid (400.00 paid on 09/04/2019, receipt number 26JVJR06), receipt number 0973-24376027, filed by Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Verdict Summaries, #3 Exhibit 3 Verdicts, #4 Exhibit 4 Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Timothy L Hix added to party Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation(pty:dft))(Hix, Timothy) Modified on 9/5/2019 (ghap). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/01/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 1/13/2020 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019
View Court Documents

(#9) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-07644 ODW(SSx). (rn) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2019
View Court Documents

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2019
View Court Documents

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2019

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Alcon Vision, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/29/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 4)(ghap) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2019

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Alcon Vision, LLC, Does 1 through 100, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Jillian Clarke. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/5/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2019
View Court Documents

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation, re Declaration #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on September 4, 2019. (Hix, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2019
View Court Documents

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation, identifying Alcon Vision, LLC f/k/a Alcon Laboratories, Inc., Ciba Vision, LLC and Alcon Laboratories, Inc. f/k/a Alcon US Holdings Corporation. (Hix, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2019
View Court Documents

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Hix, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2019
View Court Documents

(#3) DECLARATION of Sondra Davis re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Hix, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2019
View Court Documents

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Hix, Timothy) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2019
View Court Documents

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV27356 with filing fee previously paid (400.00 paid on 09/04/2019, receipt number 26JVJR06), receipt number 0973-24376027, filed by Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Verdict Summaries, #3 Exhibit 3 Verdicts, #4 Exhibit 4 Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Timothy L Hix added to party Alcon Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware corporation(pty:dft))(Hix, Timothy) Modified on 9/5/2019 (ghap). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less