This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 15:23:18 (UTC).

Jiang v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 Jiang filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Marsha J. Pechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01264

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marsha J. Pechman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fan Jiang

Respondents

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

United States Department of Homeland Security

Alejandro Mayorkas

Ur Jaddou

Donna Campagnolo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ralph Hua

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP (WA)

1700 Seventh Ave, Ste 2200

Seattle, WA 98101

Respondent Attorney

Michelle R. Lambert

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (TACOMA)

1201 Pacific Ave, Ste 700

Tacoma, WA 98402

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting Parties' #4 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Answer Deadline. Defendants' response to the Complaint is due on or before 12/14/2022. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting Parties' #4 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Answer Deadline. Defendants' response to the Complaint is due on or before 12/14/2022. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Answer Deadline, filed by Respondents Donna Campagnolo, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. Noting Date 10/28/2022, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Respondents Donna Campagnolo, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Donna Campagnolo, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (RE) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketJudge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Donna Campagnolo, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Receipt # AWAWDC-7694786) Attorney Ralph Hua added to party Fan Jiang(pty:pet), filed by Fan Jiang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hua, Ralph) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle R. Lambert