This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:12:03 (UTC).

JG ELIZABETH II, LLC v. EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 JG ELIZABETH II, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Hammer and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17044

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JG ELIZABETH II, LLC

Defendants

EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY

ABC CORPORATION

MARKEL SERVICES INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAWRENCE M. BERKELEY

Attorney at Fishman McIntyre Berkeley Levine Samansky, PC

120 Eagle Rock Avenue

East Hanover, NJ 07936

Defendant Attorney

APRIL T. VILLAVERDE

Attorney at KENNEDYSCMK LLP

120 Mountain View Boulevard, P.O. Box 650

Basking Ridge, NJ 07920

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Letter with Text of Proposed Order. Defendant shall move, answer or otherwise reply by 10/10/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/20/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order to Extend time to Answer

#4

(#4) Letter from April Villaverde. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend time to Answer)(VILLAVERDE, APRIL) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARKEL SERVICES INCORPORATED identifying Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A-F

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MARKEL SERVICES INCORPORATED, EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY from Union County, case number UNN-L-2582-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9911577), filed by MARKEL SERVICES INCORPORATED, EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(VILLAVERDE, APRIL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Letter with Text of Proposed Order. Defendant shall move, answer or otherwise reply by 10/10/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/20/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from April Villaverde. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend time to Answer)(VILLAVERDE, APRIL) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARKEL SERVICES INCORPORATED identifying Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MARKEL SERVICES INCORPORATED, EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY from Union County, case number UNN-L-2582-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9911577), filed by MARKEL SERVICES INCORPORATED, EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(VILLAVERDE, APRIL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.