This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2021 at 09:54:54 (UTC).

J.F.H. v. Travelers Indemnity Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 J F H filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00123

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J.F.H.

Defendants

Travelers Indemnity Company

Joseph Mackey

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Interested Party

Boy Scouts of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey D. Rowe

Attorney at Rouse Frets White Goss Gentile Rhodes, PC - Leawood

5250 W. 116Th Place, Suite 400

Leawood, KS 66211

Randall L. Rhodes

Attorney at Rouse Frets White Goss Gentile Rhodes, PC - Leawood

5250 W. 116Th Place, Suite 400

Leawood, KS 66211

R. Douglas Gentile

Attorney at Rouse Frets White Goss Gentile Rhodes, PC - Leawood

5250 W. 116Th Place, Suite 400

Leawood, KS 66211

Rachel N Boden

Attorney at Rouse Frets White Goss Gentile Rhodes, PC - Leawood

5250 W. 116Th Place, Suite 400

Leawood, KS 66211

Daniel Adam Kopp

Attorney at Rouse Frets White Goss Gentile Rhodes, PC - Leawood

5250 W. 116Th Place, Suite 400

Leawood, KS 66211

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren H. Navarro

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP-KCMO

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1500

Kansas City, MO 64108

Tyson H. Ketchum

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP-KCMO

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1500

Kansas City, MO 64108

Patrick J. Kenny

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP-STL

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Ste. 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

John L. Kellogg

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - KCMO

2400 Pershing Road, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2504

Angela M. Higgins

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - KCMO

2400 Pershing Road, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2504

Angela Higgins Clark

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - KCMO

2400 Pershing Road, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2504

Interested Party Attorney

Kirk T. May

Attorney at GM Law PC - KC

1201 Walnut St., 20Th Floor

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDERED that the Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Motion to Stay (Doc. # 22) and ORDERS that the above captioned matter is stayed until further order of this Court. The parties shall file a joint report on or before July 1, 2021, outlining the status of this case. Signed on 3/24/21 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#22

(#22) MOTION to Stay by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Navarro, Lauren) Modified on 3/23/2021 to correct docket entry (Houston, Kiambu). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#20

(#20) Consent MOTION for extension of time For Travelers to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Abstention and Remand filed by Lauren H. Navarro on behalf of Travelers Indemnity Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/30/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Navarro, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

19 #4

Exhibit D - Travelers letter

19 #3

Exhibit C - Agreement

19 #2

Exhibit B - Judgment issued by Judge Grate

19 #1

Exhibit A - Petition

#19

(#19) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts II and IV of Plaintiff's Petition for Damages with Prejudice filed by Randall L. Rhodes on behalf of Plaintiff J.F.H.. Reply suggestions due by 3/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment issued by Judge Grate, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Travelers letter)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Rhodes, Randall) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#13

(#21) Before this Court is #20 CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR TRAVELERS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ABSTENTION AND REMAND #13 . Consent being stated the motion is granted. Defendant Travelers Indemnity shall file Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Abstention and Remand on or before April 16, 2021. Signed on 3/17/21 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

4 #1

MAP General Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of filing Corrected Exhibit C to Notice of Removal by Travelers Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Navarro, Lauren) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by Travelers Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Navarro, Lauren) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#3) NOTICE of filing Corrected Exhibit C to Notice of Removal by Travelers Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Navarro, Lauren) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDERED that the Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Motion to Stay (Doc. # 22) and ORDERS that the above captioned matter is stayed until further order of this Court. The parties shall file a joint report on or before July 1, 2021, outlining the status of this case. Signed on 3/24/21 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to stay. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Stay by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Navarro, Lauren) Modified on 3/23/2021 to correct docket entry (Houston, Kiambu). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Before this Court is #20 CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR TRAVELERS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ABSTENTION AND REMAND #13 . Consent being stated the motion is granted. Defendant Travelers Indemnity shall file Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Abstention and Remand on or before April 16, 2021. Signed on 3/17/21 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Consent MOTION for extension of time For Travelers to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Abstention and Remand filed by Lauren H. Navarro on behalf of Travelers Indemnity Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/30/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Navarro, Lauren) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts II and IV of Plaintiff's Petition for Damages with Prejudice filed by Randall L. Rhodes on behalf of Plaintiff J.F.H.. Reply suggestions due by 3/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment issued by Judge Grate, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Travelers letter)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Rhodes, Randall) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #11 MOTION to reassign/transfer case Transfer Venue filed by Randall L. Rhodes on behalf of Plaintiff J.F.H.. Reply suggestions due by 3/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment issued by Judge Grate, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Rhodes, Randall) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of appearance by Daniel Adam Kopp on behalf of J.F.H. (Attorney Daniel Adam Kopp added to party J.F.H.(pty:pla))(Kopp, Daniel) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of filing Suggestion of Bankruptcy by Boy Scouts of America (May, Kirk) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of appearance by Kirk T. May on behalf of Boy Scouts of America (Attorney Kirk T. May added to party Boy Scouts of America(pty:intp))(May, Kirk) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts II and IV of Plaintiff's Petition for Damages with Prejudice filed by Lauren H. Navarro on behalf of Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Navarro, Lauren) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts II and IV of Plaintiff's Petition for Damages with Prejudice filed by Lauren H. Navarro on behalf of Travelers Indemnity Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/15/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Navarro, Lauren) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of filing Proof of Filing in State Court by Travelers Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Navarro, Lauren) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/12/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 3/29/2021. Signed on 2/26/21 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of appearance by Patrick J. Kenny on behalf of Travelers Indemnity Company (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Navarro, Lauren) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of filing Corrected Exhibit C to Notice of Removal by Travelers Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Navarro, Lauren) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by Travelers Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Navarro, Lauren) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri at Independence County, case number 2116-CV01378, filed by Lauren H. Navarro on behalf of Travelers Indemnity Company. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7305065. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Navarro, Lauren) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATP-INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Boy Scouts of America is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant