This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2021 at 09:24:48 (UTC).

Jezorski v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Jezorski filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03380

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherry Jezorski

Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Craig Jones

Attorney at Jones & Hill

131 Hwy 165 S

Oakdale, LA 71463

Craig Ray Hill

Attorney at Jones & Hill (OB)

P O Box 1260

Oberlin, LA 70655

Defendant Attorneys

Dan R Dorsey

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (COV)

408 N Columbia St

Covington, LA 70433-2920

Patricia P Barattini

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (COV)

408 N Columbia St

Covington, LA 70433-2920

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Jezorski. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (aty,Jones, John) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A)(Attorney Dan R Dorsey added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Dorsey, Dan) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

5 #1

Proposed order

5 #2

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Dorsey, Dan) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/19/2021. (crt,LaCombe, L) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Dorsey, Dan) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Dorsey, Dan) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 10/19/2021. (crt,LaCombe, L) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Dorsey, Dan) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A)(Attorney Dan R Dorsey added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Dorsey, Dan) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Jezorski. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (aty,Jones, John) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4828235) filed by Sherry Jezorski. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Craig Jones added to party Sherry Jezorski(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, John) Modified on 9/22/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant