This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 08:01:08 (UTC).

JetBlue Airways Corporation et al v. Anthem Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 JetBlue Airways Corporation filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Anthem Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray M Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00558

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray M Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JetBlue Airways Corporation

JetBlue Airways Group Health Insurance Plan

Kraft Heinz Company, The

Kraft Heinz Group Benefits Plan

Kraft Heinz Retiree Group Benefits Plan

McLane Foodservice Distribution Inc

Employee Benefits Plan of MBM Corporation

North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters' Health Fund

Defendants

Blue Cross of California

Blue Cross of Southern California, Inc.

Blue Cross of Northern California

Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia

Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nevada

Anthem Inc formerly doing business as WELLPOINT INC doing business as Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company

Rocky Mountain Hospital Medical Service Inc doing business as Blue Cross Blue Shield of Colorado

Anthem Insurance Companies Incorporated doing business as Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Indiana

Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky Inc doing business as Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kentucky

Anthem Health Plans of Maine Inc doing business as Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield of Maine

72 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin T Presley

Attorney at STARNES DAVIS FLORIE LLP

P.O. Box 598512

Birmingham, AL 35259-8512

David Germaine

Attorney at SPERLING & SLATER, P.C.

55 W. Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

H Thomas Wells, III

Attorney at STARNES DAVIS FLORIE LLP

P O Box 598512

Birmingham, AL 35259-8512

Jay M Ezelle

Attorney at STARNES DAVIS FLORIE LLP

100 Brookwood Place, Ste Seventh Floor

Birmingham, AL 35209

Joseph Vanek

Attorney at SPERLING & SLATER, P.C.

55 W. Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Paul Ethan Slater

Attorney at SPERLING & SLATER PC

55 W. Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kraft Heinz Retiree Group Benefits Plan, Kraft Heinz Company, The, McLane Foodservice Distribution Inc, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters' Health Fund, JetBlue Airways Group Health Insurance Plan, JetBlue Airways Corporation, Kraft Heinz Group Benefits Plan.(KAM) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit A - Civil Coversheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER denying #2 Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice, or Alternatively to Suspend the Deadline for Filing Pro Hac Vice Applications. All attorneys who have appeared and are not members of the bar of this court are ORDERED to apply to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 06/28/2022. (SUH) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4081016. related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kraft Heinz Retiree Group Benefits Plan, Kraft Heinz Company, The, McLane Foodservice Distribution Inc, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters' Health Fund, JetBlue Airways Group Health Insurance Plan, JetBlue Airways Corporation, Kraft Heinz Group Benefits Plan.(KAM). (Presley, Benjamin) NDAL rec#B4601120101 Modified on 5/6/2022 (KAM). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice or, Alternatively, to Suspend the Deadline for Filing Pro Hac Vice Applications by Employee Benefits Plan of MBM Corporation, JetBlue Airways Corporation, JetBlue Airways Group Health Insurance Plan, Kraft Heinz Company, The, Kraft Heinz Group Benefits Plan, Kraft Heinz Retiree Group Benefits Plan, McLane Foodservice Distribution Inc, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters' Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Coversheet)(Presley, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kraft Heinz Retiree Group Benefits Plan, Kraft Heinz Company, The, McLane Foodservice Distribution Inc, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters' Health Fund, JetBlue Airways Group Health Insurance Plan, JetBlue Airways Corporation, Kraft Heinz Group Benefits Plan.(KAM) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLUE CROSS OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where MEADOWBROOK MEAT COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc. is a litigant