This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2022 at 11:32:32 (UTC).

Jesse Santos Teixeira v. BMW of North America, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 Jesse Santos Teixeira filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02338

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesse Santos Teixeira

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Parnell

Attorney at Law Offices of Adam Zolonz APC

1680 Vine Street Suite 912

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Adam Martin Zolonz

Attorney at Law Offices of Adam Zolonz APC

1680 North Vine Street Suite 912

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Jeffrey A Zolonz

Attorney at Law Offices of Adam Zolonz APC

1680 North Vine Street Suite 912

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew K Stefatos

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Villegas Chinery and Douglas LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Answer

1 #3

Exhibit C - Request for Dismissal

1 #4

Exhibit D - Lease Agreement

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#4

(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (sh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (pg) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Jesse Santos Teixeira. (Parnell, Stephen) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Jesse Santos Teixeira. (Parnell, Stephen) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (pg) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (sh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Jesse Santos Teixeira as to Robert A. Smith, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 04/04/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILE COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 01/20/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO.2 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF Summons and Complaint against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does, Robert A. Smith, Inc.(Filing fee $ 402 DUE) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Jesse Santos Teixeira. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/30/21 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV43656 Receipt No: ACACDC-33092732 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Request for Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D - Lease Agreement) (Attorney Andrew K Stefatos added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew K Stefatos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman