This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2020 at 11:02:50 (UTC).

Jernigan v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 Jernigan filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Erin L. Wiedemann and P. K. Holmes III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-05115

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Erin L. Wiedemann

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justin Jernigan

Defendant

Social Security Administration Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meghan M Gallo

Attorney at Gallo Curtis & Cazort

1 Halsted Circle, Suite 4

Rogers, AR 72756

Defendant Attorneys

Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas

Attorney at OGCSSAR4

Marisa Silverman

Attorney at SSA-Ogc

1301 Young Street, Ste A702

Dallas, TX 21235

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Silverman on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Silverman, Marisa) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Justin Jernigan. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/31/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service for US Attorney of Western District of Arkansas, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service for Office of Regional Counsel, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service for US AG)(Gallo, Meghan) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***DISREGARD DUPLICATE FILING*** REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Justin Jernigan. (Gallo, Meghan) Modified on 7/16/2020 (tg). (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketTEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable P. K. Holmes III and Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann, as the referral judge. (lgd) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Justin Jernigan. (Gallo, Meghan) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Gallo, Meghan) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to William Barr, U.S. Attorney General for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Gallo, Meghan) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to U.S. Attorney's Office for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Gallo, Meghan) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filing fee paid re #2 Complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, : $ 400, receipt number BARWDC-2173020.. (Gallo, Meghan) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 magistrate consent)(lgd) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Justin Jernigan.(Gallo, Meghan) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Justin Jernigan. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less