This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:01:34 (UTC).

JERNIGAN v. PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 JERNIGAN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY D LAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00108

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAROLYN JERNIGAN

Defendants

PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC

PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC doing business as PIZZA HUT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SUNNITA BLOUNT

107 E Broad St, Po Box 135

Greensboro, GA 30642

LATOYA A HUTCHINSON

104 E Broad St, Ste B

Greensboro, GA 30642

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Anne Ackourey

100 Galleria Parkway, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

AMY COMBS BENDER

100 Galleria Pkwy Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LATOYA A HUTCHINSON on behalf of CAROLYN JERNIGAN Attorney LATOYA A HUTCHINSON added to party CAROLYN JERNIGAN(pty:pla) (HUTCHINSON, LATOYA) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

12 #1

Proposed Order Motion to Withdraw

#12

(#12) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CAROLYN JERNIGAN filed by SUNNITA BLOUNT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion to Withdraw)(BLOUNT, SUNNITA) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CAROLYN JERNIGAN. as to All Defendants (BLOUNT, SUNNITA) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

9 #4

Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order

9 #3

Exhibit C - January 10, 2020 Email

9 #2

Exhibit B - December 23, 2019 Email

9 #1

Exhibit A - Certified Mail Packet and Receipt

#9

(#9) CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC filed by Mary Anne Ackourey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Packet and Receipt, #2 Exhibit B - December 23, 2019 Email, #3 Exhibit C - January 10, 2020 Email, #4 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Ackourey, Mary) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AMY COMBS BENDER on behalf of PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC Attorney AMY COMBS BENDER added to party PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC(pty:dft) (BENDER, AMY) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Anne Ackourey on behalf of PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC Attorney Mary Anne Ackourey added to party PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC(pty:dft) (Ackourey, Mary) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A- Jernigan vs Palmetto proof of certified mailing return recei

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAROLYN JERNIGAN as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Jernigan vs Palmetto proof of certified mailing return receipt for service)(BLOUNT, SUNNITA) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-3-19. (rcg) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CAROLYN JERNIGAN issued at the direction of the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/2/2019. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ggs) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC. (ggs) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carolyn Jernigan filed by SUNNITA BLOUNT.(BLOUNT, SUNNITA) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (IFP) against Palmetto Restaurant Operations, Inc. filed by Carolyn Jernigan (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff Letter to EEOC, #4 Exhibit EEOC Letter to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #6 Exhibit GA Department of Labor Letter)(BLOUNT, SUNNITA) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney SUNNITA BLOUNT terminated Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/21/2020 (mdb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #13 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by CAROLYN JERNIGAN ); Notice to Counsel LATOYA A. HUTCHINSON - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (ggs) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LATOYA A HUTCHINSON on behalf of CAROLYN JERNIGAN Attorney LATOYA A HUTCHINSON added to party CAROLYN JERNIGAN(pty:pla) (HUTCHINSON, LATOYA) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CAROLYN JERNIGAN filed by SUNNITA BLOUNT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion to Withdraw)(BLOUNT, SUNNITA) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(d)(3), Defendant has until February 18, 2020 to answer Plaintiff's complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/15/2020. (mdb) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CAROLYN JERNIGAN. as to All Defendants (BLOUNT, SUNNITA) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC filed by Mary Anne Ackourey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Packet and Receipt, #2 Exhibit B - December 23, 2019 Email, #3 Exhibit C - January 10, 2020 Email, #4 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Ackourey, Mary) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AMY COMBS BENDER on behalf of PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC Attorney AMY COMBS BENDER added to party PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC(pty:dft) (BENDER, AMY) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Anne Ackourey on behalf of PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC Attorney Mary Anne Ackourey added to party PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC(pty:dft) (Ackourey, Mary) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAROLYN JERNIGAN as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Jernigan vs Palmetto proof of certified mailing return receipt for service)(BLOUNT, SUNNITA) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee (IFP Denied) Paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3337878, $400 (BLOUNT, SUNNITA) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-3-19. (rcg) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CAROLYN JERNIGAN issued at the direction of the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/2/2019. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ggs) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC. (ggs) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint (IFP), filed by Carolyn Jernigan ); Notice to Counsel - SUNNITA BLOUNT Your contact information (address, telephone and fax numbers and possibly e-mail) in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (ggs) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint (IFP), filed by Carolyn Jernigan ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE, corrections made by case manager. (ggs) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carolyn Jernigan filed by SUNNITA BLOUNT.(BLOUNT, SUNNITA) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (IFP) against Palmetto Restaurant Operations, Inc. filed by Carolyn Jernigan (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff Letter to EEOC, #4 Exhibit EEOC Letter to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #6 Exhibit GA Department of Labor Letter)(BLOUNT, SUNNITA) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less