This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2019 at 07:38:17 (UTC).

Jerica Michelle Jones v. James Construction Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 Jerica Michelle Jones filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against James Construction Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03567

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jerica Michelle Jones, Individually and as Administratrix of the Estate of Kenneth Wade Mcneil, Deceased

Jerica Michelle Jones

Defendants

James Construction Group, LLC

Volkert, Inc.

GEC, Inc.

C.H. Robinson

William Rawlings

Primoris Service Corporation

Traffic Solutions, Inc.

Allen Lund Company, LLC

Stevie Trucking Corporation

Barriere Construction Co., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vuk Stevan Vujasinovic

Attorney at Vujasinovic and Beckcom LLP

6363 Woodway, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77057

Brian Augustus Beckcom

Attorney at Vujasinovic Beckcom

6363 Woodway, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorneys

Norman E. Snyder, Jr.

Attorney at Tucker Taunton Snyder & Slade

10370 Richmond Ave., Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77042

Keith Ray Taunton

Attorney at Taunton, Snyder & Slade

580 Westlake Park Blvd., Suite 1120

Houston, TX 77079

Henry Dwayne Newton

Attorney at Newton, Jones & Spaeth

3405 Marquart

Houston, TX 77027

Anthony Edward Spaeth

Attorney at Newton Jones and Spaeth

3405 Marquart St

Houston, TX 77027

Grant Gealy

Attorney at Mills Shirley LLP

2228 Mechanic

Galveston, TX 77550

Roland Gene Hamilton

Attorney at Kane Russell Coleman & Logan PC

10Th Floor, 5051 Westheimer Road

Houston, TX 77056

James T Rivera

Attorney at Attorney at Law

303 W Vermilion, Ste 210

Lafayette, LA 70502

Christopher Michael Volf

Attorney at Johanson & Fairless LLP

1456 First Colony Blvd

Sugar Land, TX 77479

Robert L Klawetter

Attorney at Eastham Watson Dale & Forney

808 Travis Street,, Suite 1300

Houston, TX 77002

Christina K Schovajsa

Attorney at Eastham Watson et al

808 Travis Street, Suite 1300

Houston, TX 77002-5769

Thomas W Fee

Attorney at Fee Smith et al

Three Galleria Tower, 13155 Noel Rd, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75240

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CORRECTED ORDER To Remand(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Remand; granting #10 Motion to Supplement. The above-styled and captioned case is hereby REMANDED to the 113th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#10

(#10) First MOTION to Supplement to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand as to #6 MOTION to Remand by Jerica Michelle Jones, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/12/2019. (Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jerica Michelle Jones, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#8

(#8) First INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Volkert, Inc., filed.(Spaeth, Anthony) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by James Construction Group, LLC, Primoris Service Corporation, filed.(Snyder, Norman) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

6 #1

Proposed Order Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand by Jerica Michelle Jones, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Barriere Construction Co., LLC, James Construction Group, LLC, Primoris Service Corporation, Stevie Trucking Corporation, Traffic Solutions, Inc., Volkert, Inc., William Rawlings filed by Jerica Michelle Jones.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Allen Lund Company, LLC, filed.(Schovajsa, Christina) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#2

(#2) STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary Dismissal of Allen Lund by Jerica Michelle Jones, filed.(Beckcom, Brian) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 10/28/2019 re: 12 Document(s) Sent,, filed. (hcarr, 4) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORRECTED ORDER To Remand(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Remand; granting #10 Motion to Supplement. The above-styled and captioned case is hereby REMANDED to the 113th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) First MOTION to Supplement to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand as to #6 MOTION to Remand by Jerica Michelle Jones, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/12/2019. (Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jerica Michelle Jones, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Volkert, Inc., filed.(Spaeth, Anthony) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by James Construction Group, LLC, Primoris Service Corporation, filed.(Snyder, Norman) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Remand by Jerica Michelle Jones, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Barriere Construction Co., LLC, James Construction Group, LLC, Primoris Service Corporation, Stevie Trucking Corporation, Traffic Solutions, Inc., Volkert, Inc., William Rawlings filed by Jerica Michelle Jones.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Allen Lund Company, LLC, filed.(Schovajsa, Christina) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary Dismissal of Allen Lund by Jerica Michelle Jones, filed.(Beckcom, Brian) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151ST Judicial District Court of Harris County Texas, case number 2019-11070 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23220986) filed by Allen Lund Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Klawetter, Robert) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARRIERO CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLEN LUND CO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEC is a litigant

Latest cases where JAMES CONSTRUCTION GROUP, L.L.C. is a litigant