This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2021 at 08:47:23 (UTC).

Jensen v. Notre Dame Du Lac University of

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 Jensen filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Notre Dame Du Lac University of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert L Miller, Jr and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00346

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert L Miller, Jr

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

April Jensen

Defendants

University of Notre Dame Du Lac

Notre Dame Du Lac University of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Annavieve C Conklin

Attorney at DeLaney & DeLaney LLC

3646 N Washington Blvd

Indianapolis, IN 46205

Kathleen A DeLaney

Attorney at DeLaney & DeLaney LLC

3646 N Washington Blvd

Indianapolis, IN 46205

Danya M Keller PHV

Attorney at Newkirk Zwagerman PLC

521 E Locust St Ste 300

Des Moines, IA 50322

Thomas J Bullock PHV

Attorney at Newkirk Zwagerman PLC

521 E Locust St Ste 300

Des Moines, IA 50322

Thomas A Newkirk PHV

Attorney at Newkirk Zwagerman PLC

521 E Locust St Ste 300

Des Moines, IA 50322

Defendant Attorney

Felicia S O'Connor

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP - Det/MI

500 Woodward Ave Ste 2700

Detroit, MI 48226-3489

 

Court Documents

#19

#17

#16

#15

#13

#12

#11

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

#2

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #19 Second Joint Motion For Extension Of Time For Defendant To File Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint is granted. University of Notre Dame Du Lac's answer due 8/30/2021. Text order only. (lhc) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Notre Dame Du Lac University of. (O'Connor, Felicia) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #17 Joint Motion to Adjourn Preliminary Pretrial Conference and Extend Deadline to file Proposed Discovery Plan is granted. The telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 10:30 am is VACATED, to be set after Dft files an Answer. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery Plan and to Adjourn Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Defendant Notre Dame Du Lac University of. (O'Connor, Felicia) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Dft to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint is granted. The deadline for Dft to file an Answer is extended to and including 7/15/2021. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Notre Dame Du Lac University of. (O'Connor, Felicia) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Felicia S O'Connor on behalf of Notre Dame Du Lac University of (O'Connor, Felicia) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas A Newkirk PHV for April Jensen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 5/28/2021. (ace) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas J Bullock PHV for April Jensen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 5/28/2021. (ace) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application for Attorney Thomas Bullock to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of April Jensen. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4585833(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Attorney Danya Keller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of April Jensen. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4584021(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/25/2021 to include federal court status) (ace). Modified on 5/25/2021 (ace). (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application for Attorney Thomas Newkirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of April Jensen. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4584003(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/25/2021 to include state court status) (ace). Modified on 5/25/2021 (ace). (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by April Jensen. Notre Dame Du Lac University of served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Notre Dame Du Lac University of. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kms) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docket**New case** Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (kms) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Annavieve C Conklin on behalf of April Jensen (Conklin, Annavieve) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A DeLaney on behalf of April Jensen (DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against University of Notre Dame Du Lac( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4575256.), filed by April Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University Of Notre Dame is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Felicia S. O'Connor