This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2021 at 08:15:04 (UTC).

Jensen v. CRST Expedited, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Jensen filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CRST Expedited, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-07741

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Allen Jensen

Defendant

CRST Expedited, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chaim Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Farrah Grant

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Thomas Alistair Segal

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard,Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

David Keledjian

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Carl Smedstad

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson & Feary, P.C.

30 W. Monroe Street, Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60603-2427

James H. Hanson

Attorney at Scopelitis, Garvin, Light & Hanson

10 W. Market Street, Suite 1500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Rebecca Renee Brown

Attorney at Scopelitis, Garvin, Light, Hanson & Feary, LLP

2 North Lake Avenue, Suite 560

Pasadena, CA 91101

Charles Andrewscavage

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson and Feary, P.C.

30 West Monroe St., Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60603

Jared Sean Kramer

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson Feary PC

30 W Monroe Street, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; ; denying (14) Motion to Dismiss ; granting (19) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:21-cv-07741-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#37

(#37) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held via Zoom Webinar Videoconference on 11/30/2021 re (19 in 4:21-cv-07741-YGR) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Michael Allen Jensen, AND (14 in 4:21-cv-07741-YGR) Amended MOTION (11) MOTION to Dismiss Under First-to-File Rule filed by CRST Expedited, Inc.. Status Conference held in the four related cases listed in these Minutes on 11/30/2021.Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2021) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

34 #1

Declaration of Shaun Setareh in Support of Motion to Consolidate

34 #34

Main Document

33 #2

Declaration of Michael Gannon in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Moti

33 #1

Declaration of Don Sandridge in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motio

19 #1

Proposed Order

19 #19

Main Document

#14

(#35) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE Amended Motion to Dismiss #14 and the Motion to Consolidate #19 Hearing set for 11/30/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion [14 and Motion #19 Hearing set for 11/30/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Related documents(s) #19 , #14 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Allen Jensen.. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 10/5/2021) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by CRST Expedited, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CRST International Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Hillcrest Holdings, Inc. for CRST Expedited, Inc. (Smedstad, Adam) (Filed on 10/5/2021) Modified on 10/6/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/27/20 21. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#2

1 #4

Defendants Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entit

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; ; denying (14) Motion to Dismiss ; granting (19) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:21-cv-07741-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held via Zoom Webinar Videoconference on 11/30/2021 re (19 in 4:21-cv-07741-YGR) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Michael Allen Jensen, AND (14 in 4:21-cv-07741-YGR) Amended MOTION (11) MOTION to Dismiss Under First-to-File Rule filed by CRST Expedited, Inc.. Status Conference held in the four related cases listed in these Minutes on 11/30/2021.Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2021) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#36) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM STATUS HEARING FOR RELATED CASES **20-CV-5473-YGR;** 21-CV-4952-YGR ; 21-CV-7474-YGR regarding the Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 21-7741-YGR. Status Conference set for 11/30/2021 02:01 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 11/30/2021 02:01 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021) Modified on 11/30/2021 (fs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE Amended Motion to Dismiss #14 and the Motion to Consolidate #19 Hearing set for 11/30/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion [14 and Motion #19 Hearing set for 11/30/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Related documents(s) #19 , #14 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) REPLY (re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byMichael Allen Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shaun Setareh in Support of Motion to Consolidate)(Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 11/15/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byCRST Expedited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Sandridge in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate, #2 Declaration of Michael Gannon in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate)(Andrewscavage, Charles) (Filed on 11/8/2021) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Charles Andrewscavage. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jared S. Kramer. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16518021.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/20/2021 filed by CRST Expedited, Inc.. (Andrewscavage, Charles) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16518183.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/20/2021 filed by CRST Expedited, Inc.. (Kramer, Jared) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE,. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Adva nced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 14, 2022 by Noon.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/z oom/. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Allen Jensen.. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 10/5/2021) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by CRST Expedited, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CRST International Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Hillcrest Holdings, Inc. for CRST Expedited, Inc. (Smedstad, Adam) (Filed on 10/5/2021) Modified on 10/6/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities must be filed as a separate event. This portion of the filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety Re: #1 -4 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities filed by CRST Expedited, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/27/20 21. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings by CRST Expedited, Inc. (Smedstad, Adam) (Filed on 10/4/2021) Modified on 10/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION NOTICE OF REMOVAL (jury demand by both) from Superior Court of California, San Francisco County. Their case number is CGC-21-594399. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16460211). Filed by CRST Expedited, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Defendants Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons)(Smedstad, Adam) (Filed on 10/4/2021) Modified on 10/5/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRST Expedited, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jared S Kramer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Andrewscavage