This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:06:19 (UTC).

Jennings v. Walmart Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Jennings filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruben Castillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03804

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ruben Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melvin Jennings

Defendant

Walmart Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeff Adam Saltzman

Attorney at Law Offices of Jeff A. Saltzman

1821 Walden Office Square, Suite 400

Schaumburg, IL 60173

Defendant Attorneys

Ariel Terese Flood

Attorney at O'hagan Meyer, Llc

1 East Wacker Drive, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

James P. Balog

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer, LLC

One E. Wacker Drive, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County Law Division, case number (2019L003690) filed by Walmart Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15905370. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Balog, James) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: After a careful review of this recently removed state court complaint, said complaint is dismissed without prejudice to the filing of a proper amended federal complaint or a timely motion to remand. The parties are requested to exhaust all settlement possibilities prior to filing any further pleadings. (rao, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walmart Inc. by James P. Balog (Balog, James) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Balog, James) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel of record. (smm, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walmart Inc. by Ariel Terese Flood (Flood, Ariel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #6 sent to Attorney Jeff Adam Saltzman returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Jeff Adam Saltzman a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (mc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #6 sent to Attorney Jeff Adam Saltzman returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Jeff Adam Saltzman a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (mc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: After a careful review of this recently removed state court complaint, said complaint is dismissed without prejudice to the filing of a proper amended federal complaint or a timely motion to remand. The parties are requested to exhaust all settlement possibilities prior to filing any further pleadings. (rao, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel of record. (smm, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walmart Inc. by Ariel Terese Flood (Flood, Ariel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walmart Inc. by James P. Balog (Balog, James) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Balog, James) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County Law Division, case number (2019L003690) filed by Walmart Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15905370. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Balog, James) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.