This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/10/2020 at 09:08:15 (UTC).

Jennings v. Ivey et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Jennings filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Ivey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry F. Moorer and Katherine P. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00399

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry F. Moorer

Referral Judge

Katherine P. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nevis Jennings

Atmore, AL 36503-3700

Defendants and Interpleaders

Doctor Bose

Therapist Pearson

Jefferson Dunn

Kay Ivey

Doctor Blalock

Doctor Livingston

Doctor Henderson

Nurse Dortch

Wexford Medical Sources, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Order, REFERRING action to the Magistrate for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/29/2020. (copy to Pltf) (mab) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#6

(#6) Partial Filing fee: $3.90, receipt number 46031054261. (skb) Referred to MJ/Nelson (PSU). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Order GRANTING #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing payment of partial filing fee. Plaintiff shall REMIT $3.90 by 9/14/2020. If money order is timely received, Clerk is directed to forward this action to the undersigned judge for review as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/21/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff. (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nevis Jennings. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (srd) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Order re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nevis Jennings. Plaintiff is ordered to complete and file Court's Motion for IFP or pay $400.00 filing fee by 9/11/2020 as set out. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff IFP form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/12/2020. (srd) Copies to Plaintiff. (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nevis Jennings. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (srd) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#1

(#1) 1983 COMPLAINT against Doctor Blalock, Doctor Bose, Nurse Dortch, Jefferson Dunn, Doctor Henderson, Kay Ivey, Doctor Livingston, Therapist Pearson, Wexford Medical Sources, Inc., filed by Nevis Jennings. (srd) Referred to Judge Nelson (PSU). (Entered: 08/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order, REFERRING action to the Magistrate for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/29/2020. (copy to Pltf) (mab) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Partial Filing fee: $3.90, receipt number 46031054261. (skb) Referred to MJ/Nelson (PSU). (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order GRANTING #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing payment of partial filing fee. Plaintiff shall REMIT $3.90 by 9/14/2020. If money order is timely received, Clerk is directed to forward this action to the undersigned judge for review as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/21/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff. (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nevis Jennings. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (srd) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nevis Jennings. Plaintiff is ordered to complete and file Court's Motion for IFP or pay $400.00 filing fee by 9/11/2020 as set out. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff IFP form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/12/2020. (srd) Copies to Plaintiff. (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nevis Jennings. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson (PSU). (srd) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 1983 COMPLAINT against Doctor Blalock, Doctor Bose, Nurse Dortch, Jefferson Dunn, Doctor Henderson, Kay Ivey, Doctor Livingston, Therapist Pearson, Wexford Medical Sources, Inc., filed by Nevis Jennings. (srd) Referred to Judge Nelson (PSU). (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wexford Medical Sources, Inc. is a litigant