This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 07:59:40 (UTC).

Jennings et al v. Apple, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Jennings filed an Other lawsuit against Apple, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray M Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01232

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray M Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rita Jennings

Bobby Wheeler

Wanda Pacino

Georgia Crawford

Taneese Evans

Brittany Lashay Jones

Gayla Terry

Defendant

Apple Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dargan Maner Ware

Attorney at DAVIS & NORRIS, LLP

2154 Highland Avenue

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey P Doss

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Lana Alcorn Olson

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

The Clark Building, 400 20Th Street N

Birmingham, AL 35203

M Wesley Smithart

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Sara Anne Ford

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street, North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 9/28/2021 unless they unanimously consent to the dispositive jurisdiction of a magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 9/22/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; parties to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 9/22/2021, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/13/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

15 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00316. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Transfer. This action is hereby TRANSFERRED to that district venue to which all parties have consented, the United States District Court for The Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/10/2021. (eec) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re: #7 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Plaintiffs' consent filed by Georgia Crawford, Taneese Evans, Rita Jennings, Brittany Lashay Jones, Wanda Pacino, Gayla Terry, Bobby Wheeler. (Ware, Dargan) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#12

(#12) Order re: #7 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer filed by Apple, Inc., ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 9/16/2021.). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/9/2021. (eec) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER on #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Apple, Inc.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/8/2021. (eec) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff P. Doss on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Doss, Jeff) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lana Alcorn Olson on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Olson, Lana) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by M. Wesley Smithart on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Smithart, M.) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer filed by Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Georgia Crawford, Taneese Evans, Rita Jennings, Brittany Lashay Jones, Wanda Pacino, Gayla Terry, Bobby Wheeler (Ware, Dargan) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/21/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit A. Letter from Apple to Congress

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2840868, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Brittany Lashay Jones, Wanda Pacino, Gayla Terry, Bobby Wheeler, Georgia Crawford, Rita Jennings, Taneese Evans. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. Letter from Apple to Congress) (Ware, Dargan) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/20/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 9/28/2021 unless they unanimously consent to the dispositive jurisdiction of a magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 9/22/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; parties to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 9/22/2021, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/13/2021. (KAM) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00316. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Transfer. This action is hereby TRANSFERRED to that district venue to which all parties have consented, the United States District Court for The Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/10/2021. (eec) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re: #7 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Plaintiffs' consent filed by Georgia Crawford, Taneese Evans, Rita Jennings, Brittany Lashay Jones, Wanda Pacino, Gayla Terry, Bobby Wheeler. (Ware, Dargan) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Order re: #7 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer filed by Apple, Inc., ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 9/16/2021.). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/9/2021. (eec) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER on #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Apple, Inc.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/8/2021. (eec) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff P. Doss on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Doss, Jeff) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lana Alcorn Olson on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Olson, Lana) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by M. Wesley Smithart on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Smithart, M.) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer filed by Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Apple, Inc.. (Ford, Sara) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Georgia Crawford, Taneese Evans, Rita Jennings, Brittany Lashay Jones, Wanda Pacino, Gayla Terry, Bobby Wheeler (Ware, Dargan) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2840868, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Brittany Lashay Jones, Wanda Pacino, Gayla Terry, Bobby Wheeler, Georgia Crawford, Rita Jennings, Taneese Evans. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. Letter from Apple to Congress) (Ware, Dargan) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 9/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara A Ford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey P Doss