This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2022 at 10:09:13 (UTC).

Jennings County School Corporation v. JUUL Labs, Inc. f/k/a PAX Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Jennings County School Corporation filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JUUL Labs, Inc f/k/a PAX Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-03584

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennings County School Corporation

Defendants

JUUL Labs, Inc.

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Hoyoung Huh

Riaz Valani

Altria Group, Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Phillip Cartmell

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

 

Court Documents

7 #9

Summons Returned Executed

7 #8

Summons Returned Executed

7 #7

Summons Returned Executed

7 #6

Summons Returned Executed

7 #5

Summons Returned Executed

7 #4

Summons Returned Executed

7 #3

Summons Returned Executed

7 #2

Summons Returned Executed

7 #1

Summons Returned Executed

7 #7

Main Document

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Adam Bowen, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

3 #4

*Restricted*

3 #3

Exhibit A - Redacted Complaint

3 #2

Proposed Order

3 #1

Declaration

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Cartmell, Thomas) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

1 #1

Appendix A

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennings County School Corporation. Adam Bowen served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022; Altria Client Services LLC served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022; Altria Group Distribution Company served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022; Altria Group, Inc. served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022; Hoyoung Huh served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022; James Monsees served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022; Juul Labs, Inc. served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022; Nicholas Pritzker served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022; Philip Morris USA, Inc. served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022; Riaz Valani served on 6/27/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed, #2 Summons Returned Executed, #3 Summons Returned Executed, #4 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed, #6 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons Returned Executed, #8 Summons Returned Executed, #9 Summons Returned Executed)(Cartmell, Thomas) (Filed on 7/19/2022) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal per 19-md-2913 MDL Dkt. No. 1277. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2022) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Adam Bowen, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL2913, Jennings County School Corporation v. JUUL Labs, Inc. f/k/a PAX Labs, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 22-cv-03584 cc: JPMDL (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Jennings County School Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Unredacted Complaint)(Cartmell, Thomas) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Cartmell, Thomas) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Redacted) against Adam Bowen, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, JUUL Labs, Inc. f/k/a PAX Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17273947.). Filed byJennings County School Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cartmell, Thomas) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUUL Labs, Inc. is a litigant