This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2021 at 09:16:01 (UTC).

Jenna Marketing L L C v. Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 Jenna Marketing L L C filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J Hanna and James D Cain, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00456

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jenna Marketing L L C

Defendants

Does 1-10, inclusive

Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Larry Craig Russ

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd Ste 12Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Nathan Daniel Meyer

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd Ste 12Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Taylor Michelle LeDuff

Attorney at Adams & Reese (BR)

450 Laurel St Ste 1900

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Grant J Guillot

Attorney at Adams & Reese (BR)

450 Laurel St Ste 1900

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Mark R Beebe

Attorney at Adams & Reese (NO)

701 Poydras St Ste 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

Kellen James Mathews

Attorney at Adams & Reese (BR)

450 Laurel St Ste 1900

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Defendant Attorneys

Jonesh G Daryanani

Attorney at Perkins Coie (CA)

1888 Century Park E Ste 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jill Louise Ripke

Attorney at Perkins Coie (CA)

1888 Century Park E Ste 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Claude Favrot Reynaud, III

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois et al (NO)

400 Poydras St Ste 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jennifer E Michel

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois et al (LAF)

100 E Vermilion St Ste 300

Lafayette, LA 70501

 

Court Documents

#39

38 #1

Proposed order

#38

#37

#36

34 #2

Proposed Order

34 #1

Exhibit A

#34

#33

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCases associated. Create association to 6:20-cv-01424-JDC-PJH. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER granting #38 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Lead Case Number: 6:20-cv-1424 with Member Case Number(s): 6:21-cv-0456. Order also docketed in member case as Document #27). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/29/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Case with Case Number 6:20-cv-01424 by Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C, Jenna Marketing L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Reynaud, Claude) Modified on 3/25/2021 to add filer (Jones, P). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Nathan Daniel Meyer for Jenna Marketing L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/19/2021. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/19/2021. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/18/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION for Nathan D. Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4610836) by Jenna Marketing L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Mathews, Kellen) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION for Larry C. Russ to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4610823) by Jenna Marketing L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Mathews, Kellen) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting #29 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Jennifer E Michel for Krispy Krunchy Foods L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/12/2021. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Judge Michael J Juneau no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 3/11/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonesh G Daryanani counsel for Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC. Adding Jon Daryanani as counsel of record for Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC. (Attorney Jonesh G Daryanani added to party Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC(pty:dft))(Daryanani, Jonesh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jenna Marketing, LLC, upon Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mary Felsher, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meyer, Nathan) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jenna Marketing, LLC. (Russ, Larry) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jenna Marketing, LLC, (Russ, Larry) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jenna Marketing, LLC. (Russ, Larry) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29061839 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jenna Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Larry C Russ added to party Jenna Marketing, LLC(pty:pla))(Russ, Larry) [Transferred from California Central on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jill Louise Ripke(Designation Retained)