This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2019 at 08:34:19 (UTC).

Jenkins v. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by Jenkins against Berryhill in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03831

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

Referral Judge

Frances H Stacy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yolanda L. Jenkins

Defendant

Nancy A Berryhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Foster Andrews

Attorney at The Law Office of James F. Andrews

709 Studewood

Houston, TX 77007

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person, filed.(thanniable, 4) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill filed by Yolanda L. Jenkins. Application to Proceed IFP Granted on October 3 2019 by Judge Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(JenniferOlson, 4) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.