This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2019 at 10:44:09 (UTC).

Jenam Tech, LLC v. LG ELECTRONICS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 Jenam Tech, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LG ELECTRONICS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly C Priest Johnson and Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00249

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kimberly C Priest Johnson

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jenam Tech, LLC

Defendants

LG ELECTRONICS, INC.

LG ELECTRONICS MOBILECOMM U.S.A., INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin R Johnson

Attorney at Toler Law Group, PC

8500 Bluffstone Cove, Ste A201

Austin, TX 78759

Jeffrey G Toler

Attorney at Toler Law Group, PC

8500 Bluffstone Cove, Ste A201

Austin, TX 78759

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER - GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. 1) is hereby extended to August 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 5/17/2019. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by LG ELECTRONICS MOBILECOMM U.S.A., INC., LG ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Toler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED submitted DOCUMENT #8 - THE COMPLETED TWO PAGE SUMMONS FORM WAS NOT FILED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenam Tech, LLC. LG ELECTRONICS MOBILECOMM U.S.A., INC. served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Toler, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/30/2019 (baf, ). (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to LG ELECTRONICS MOBILECOMM U.S.A., INC.. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to LG ELECTRONICS, INC.. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin R Johnson on behalf of Jenam Tech, LLC (Johnson, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G Toler on behalf of Jenam Tech, LLC (Toler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Toler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jenam Tech, LLC (Toler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7209631.), filed by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Toler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jenam Tech, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey G Toler