Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2021 at 09:38:45 (UTC).

Jenam Tech, LLC v. Google, LLC

Case Summary

On March 17, 2021, Jenam Tech, LLC (“Jenam Tech” or “Plaintiff”), represented by James M. Lennon of Devlin Law Firm LLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Google, LLC ( “Google” or “Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief and damages with prejudgment and post judgment interests among other reliefs, for alleged unlawful infringement of United States patents owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 10,951,742 entitled “Methods, Systems, and Computer Program Products for Sharing Information for Detecting at Least One Time Period for a Connection”(“the ʼ742 patent”) owned by the them.

 

The Plaintiff alleged that Google has infringed ‘742 Patent by “(i) making, using, selling, importing, and/or offering for sale one or more websites or web addresses including, but not limited to www.google.com, stored and/or hosted on one or more servers owned or under the control of Google, as well as other Google products and services including, but not limited to: Google Edge Network, Google Cloud, Chrome Enterprise, G suite , Google Play, Chrome, Android (Android Enterprise, Android Messages (RCS)), Duo, Google Ads, Adwords, Google Analytics, YouTube, Google Mobile apps, Google Shopping, and Google Maps (“Accused Software”); (ii) making, using, selling, importing, and/or offering for sale software for smartphones and tablets as well as other computing devices, or offering said software with such computing devices (e.g., Pixel phones, laptops, desktops, Chromebooks, etc.) (“Accused Products”); or (iii) regularly doing or soliciting business, engaging in other persistent courses of conduct, or deriving substantial revenue from goods and services provided to citizens and residents in Texas.”

 

Furthermore, Plaintiff alleged that upon information and belief that “Google has engaged in such actions with specific intent to cause infringement or with willful blindness to the resulting infringement because the Google has had actual knowledge of the ’742 patent and that its acts were inducing infringement of the ’742 patent since Google has had knowledge of the ’742 patent.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the infringement of the ʼ742 patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271 (b), wherein it has been alleged that Google has induced and continues to induce others to infringe at least claims 1 and 78 of the ’742 by, among other things, and with specific intent or willful blindness, actively aiding and abetting others to infringe, including but not limited to Google’s partners and customers, whose use of the Accused Software and Accused Products constitutes direct infringement of at least claims 1 and 78 of the ’742 patent.



In its prayer for relief, the plaintiff has requested the court to declare that the Defendant has infringed the patent in suit and to award damages as claimed, with prejudgment and post judgment interests along with attorneys’ fees and enhanced damages as appropriate against Defendant as provided by 35 U.S.C. § 285 and other costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00271

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jenam Tech, LLC

Defendant

Google, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James M. Lennon

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Defendant Attorneys

Michael E. Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton PC

110 N College, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Patrick C. Clutter

Attorney at Potter Minton, P.C.

110 North College Avenue,Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick C. Clutter on behalf of Google, LLC. Attorney Patrick C. Clutter added to party Google, LLC(pty:dft) (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Google, LLC. Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Google, LLC(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenam Tech, LLC. Google, LLC served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Google, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14603894), filed by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

3 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Google, LLC answer due 6/14/2021. (bw) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendant Google LLCs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. After consideration of said unopposed motion, the Court finds that it should be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Google LLC has up to and including June 14, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Jenam Tech, LLCs Complaint for Patent Infringement.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick C. Clutter on behalf of Google, LLC. Attorney Patrick C. Clutter added to party Google, LLC(pty:dft) (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Google, LLC. Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Google, LLC(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenam Tech, LLC. Google, LLC served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Google, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14603894), filed by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Michael Lennon