This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 15:44:36 (UTC).

Jenam Tech, LLC v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Jenam Tech, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00453

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jenam Tech, LLC

Defendant

Google LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James M. Lennon

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick C. Clutter

Attorney at Potter Minton, P.C.

110 North College Avenue,Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Matthew M. Werdegar

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Ryan K. Wong

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Rylee Kercher Olm

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Katie Lynn Joyce

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Robert A. Van Nest

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Michelle Ybarra

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-7188

Brian L. Ferrall

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Kristin E. Hucek

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Michael E. Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton PC

110 N College, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Edward A. Bayley

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Jason S. George

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

1 #15

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Google LLC. Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Google LLC(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenam Tech, LLC. Google LLC served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (lad) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Timothy Devlin, Derek Dahlgren and Cory Edwards. (lad) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Lennon, James) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13620582), filed by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lennon, James) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jenam Tech, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Michael Lennon