This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2022 at 07:02:51 (UTC).

Jenam Tech, LLC v. Google, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 Jenam Tech, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-09318

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Jenam Tech, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Google LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Derek F Dahlgren

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Mariam Clayton

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

James M. Lennon

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1306 N. Broom Street, 1St Floor

Wilmington, DE 19806

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Anjali Srinivasan

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Edward A. Bayley

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Michael E. Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton PC

110 N College, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Patrick C. Clutter

Attorney at Potter Minton, P.C.

110 North College Avenue,Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Jason S George

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest and Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Katie Lynn Joyce

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest and Peters LLP

633 Battery St

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kristin E. Hucek

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Matthew M. Werdegar

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Batter Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Matthew Mickle Werdegar

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Michelle Ybarra

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-7188

Robert A. Van Nest

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Ryan K. Wong

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Rylee Kercher Olm

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #46 Stipulation. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#46

(#46) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (re Consolidating Related Cases For All Purposes filed by Google LLC. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/29/2021) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#45

(#45) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice i s required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 24, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.< /p< Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

44 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

44 #44

Main Document

42 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

42 #42

Main Document

#40

(#40) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google LLC.. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2021) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#117

(#43) ORDER RELATING CASE. Motions terminated: (116 in 4:21-cv-07994-JST) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Google LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 10, 2021. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2021) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenam Tech, LLC. Google, LLC served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Google, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #46 Stipulation. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (re Consolidating Related Cases For All Purposes filed by Google LLC. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/29/2021) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice i s required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 24, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.< /p< Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER RELATING CASE. Motions terminated: (116 in 4:21-cv-07994-JST) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Google LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 10, 2021. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2021) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/09/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2021) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docket(#41) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2021) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google LLC.. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/8/2021) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/17/2021. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2021) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick C. Clutter on behalf of Google, LLC. Attorney Patrick C. Clutter added to party Google, LLC(pty:dft) (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Google, LLC. Attorney Michael E. Jones added to party Google, LLC(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenam Tech, LLC. Google, LLC served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Google, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14603894), filed by Jenam Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lennon, James) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jenam Tech, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin E. Hucek

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anjali Srinivasan