This case was last updated from PACER on 08/28/2020 at 12:15:57 (UTC).

Jem Accessories, Inc. v. JVC USA et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 Jem Accessories, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against JVC USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04984

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jem Accessories, Inc. d/b/a Xtreme Cables

Jem Accessories, Inc. doing business as Xtreme Cables

Defendants

JVC USA

Harman International Industries, Inc.

JVC Kenwood USA Corp.

JVCKENWOOD USA Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Peter Resnick

Attorney at Sherman, Silverstein, Kohl, Rose & Podolsky, P.A.

308 Harper Drive, Suite 200

Moorestown, NJ 08057

Defendant Attorneys

Monica Susan Asher

Attorney at McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP (NY)

340 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10173

Jonathon Brugh Lower

Attorney at Gibbons P.C. (NY)

One Pennsylvania Plaza, 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10119

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Monica S. Asher dated August 27, 2020. Document filed by Harman International Industries, Inc...(Asher, Monica) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#19

(#19) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JVCKENWOOD Corporation for JVCKENWOOD USA Corporation. Document filed by JVCKENWOOD USA Corporation..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathon Brugh Lower on behalf of JVCKENWOOD USA Corporation..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The deadline for Defendant Harman International Industries, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to October 9, 2020. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on all defendants who are not represented by counsel in this action and to retain proof of service. Harman International Industries, Inc. answer due 10/9/2020. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/18/2020) (mro) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#16

(#16) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #14 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Monica S. Asher dated 8/17/2020. Document filed by Harman International Industries, Inc...(Asher, Monica) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. JVCKENWOOD USA Corporation waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. Document filed by Jem Accessories, Inc...(Resnick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

14 #1

Certificate of Service

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Harman International Industries, Inc., JVCKENWOOD USA Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jem Accessories, Inc. d/b/a Xtreme Cables. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service).(Resnick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Harman International Industries, Inc. served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. Service was accepted by Registered Agent. Document filed by Jem Accessories, Inc. d/b/a Xtreme Cables..(Resnick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#5

No Description Available

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Resnick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 JVC

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The parties' motion to adjourn the September 10, 2020 initial pretrial conference, is granted. The initial pretrial conference will be held by telephone on October 23, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's web page, for the dial-in number and access code and other relevant information. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of those rules. The parties' joint letter and proposed case management statement, referenced in Dkt. No. 3, are due no later than October 16, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Monica S. Asher dated August 27, 2020. Document filed by Harman International Industries, Inc...(Asher, Monica) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#20) ORDER. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 10, 2020 at 1:00 p.m., see Dkt. No. 3, will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's web page, for the dial-in number and access code and other relevant information. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of those rules. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JVCKENWOOD Corporation for JVCKENWOOD USA Corporation. Document filed by JVCKENWOOD USA Corporation..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathon Brugh Lower on behalf of JVCKENWOOD USA Corporation..(Lower, Jonathon) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The deadline for Defendant Harman International Industries, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to October 9, 2020. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on all defendants who are not represented by counsel in this action and to retain proof of service. Harman International Industries, Inc. answer due 10/9/2020. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/18/2020) (mro) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #14 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Monica S. Asher dated 8/17/2020. Document filed by Harman International Industries, Inc...(Asher, Monica) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. JVCKENWOOD USA Corporation waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. Document filed by Jem Accessories, Inc...(Resnick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Harman International Industries, Inc., JVCKENWOOD USA Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jem Accessories, Inc. d/b/a Xtreme Cables. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service).(Resnick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Harman International Industries, Inc. served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. Service was accepted by Registered Agent. Document filed by Jem Accessories, Inc. d/b/a Xtreme Cables..(Resnick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Peter Resnick to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant's name and address field is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JVC USA, JVC Kenwood USA Corp., Harman Interntional Industries, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jem Accessories, Inc. d/b/a Xtreme Cables..(Resnick, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/16/2020 (pc). (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/3/2020) (mro) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Resnick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Peter Resnick to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Peter Resnick. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Harman International Industries, Inc., JVC Kenwood USA Corp., JVC USA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20470964)Document filed by Jem Accessories, Inc. d/b/a Xtreme Cables. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 JVC, #2 Exhibit 2 JBL).(Resnick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARMAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where JVCKENWOOD USA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica Susan Asher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. BRUGH LOWER