Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/18/2021 at 08:39:14 (UTC).

Cook et al v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On February 17, 2021, Jeffrey Cook and Susan Cook individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated (“Plaintiffs”), represented by Gregory Bradley Linkh of Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP filed a class action lawsuit against HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.(“HarperCollins”), Simon & Schuster, Inc.( “Simon & Schuster”), Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC(“Macmillan”), Hachette Book Group (“Hachette”), Penguin Random House LLC (“Penguin”) (these five collectively called the Big Five) and Amazon.Com, Inc., (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages and various other reliefs for alleged anti competitive conduct. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in  the Southern District of New York with Judge Debra C. Freeman and Judge Gregory H. Woods presiding.

 

Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(b)(3), the Plaintiff asserted to have filed the claim on behalf of all persons who, on or after February 17, 2017, purchased one or more eBooks sold by the Big Five through any retail e-commerce channel in the United States other than Amazon.com.

 

In the complaint Plaintiff alleged that “The Big Five sell their eBooks through booksellers’ online retail platforms, like Amazon, Barnes & Noble and Apple Books, as well as through their own websites. When they sell eBooks through an online retail platform, the Big Five use an agency model, in which the transaction occurs directly between the publisher and the retail consumer, with the eBook retailer serving as the publisher’s agent and taking a commission on each book sold.” and that “Defendants agreed to restrain competition by controlling the prices paid for eBooks purchased from the Big Five through retail platforms other than Amazon.com. This caused Plaintiffs and the class to overpay for eBooks.”

 

Plaintiff alleged that “Amazon has obtained monopoly power in the U.S. retail trade eBook market, where it accounts for 90% of all eBook sales. Through its conspiracy with the Big Five, Defendant Amazon has willfully acquired its monopoly power in the U.S. retail trade eBook market through anticompetitive conduct, fixing the retail prices of trade eBooks and causing supracompetitive prices for eBooks sold by or through Amazon’s eBook retailer rivals. Such conduct is an abuse of monopoly power in violation of Section 2 of the Sherman Act.” and further that “Defendants’ anticompetitive agreements have the intent and effect of injuring consumers by eliminating the price competition that Amazon.com would otherwise face and by raising eBook prices sold through Amazon’s retail rivals above the price that the eBooks would be sold in the absence of this restraint.”

 

There are two claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs. The First claim for relief is for violation of 15 U.S.C. § 1 and the second one is for violation of 15 U.S.C. § 2. 

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs requested the court to pass an order to define the class as requested and to certify this as a class action in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23, to declare that Defendants have violated Sherman Act, 15 U.S.C. § 1 and 2. The Plaintiffs further requested the Court to award damages, pre-judgment and post-judgment interest along with costs of action. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01369

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra C. Freeman

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Susan Cook

Jeffrey Cook

Defendants

Amazon.Com, Inc.

HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.

Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC

Hachette Book Group

Simon & Schuster, Inc.

Penguin Random House LLC

Interested Parties

Mary Christopherson-Juve

Michael Wilder

Sandra Wilde

Shannon Fremgen

Denise DeLeon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Bradley Linkh

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

77 Water Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Jeffrey J. Corrigan

Attorney at Spector Roseman & Kodroff, P.C.

2001 Market Street, Suite 3420

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Charles Scott Lent

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP (NYC)

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Joel M. Mitnick

Attorney at Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP

200 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10281

Robert Michael Swenson

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (NYC)

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Jeffrey Leonard White

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP

1300 Eye St. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Yehudah Lev Buchweitz

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (NYC)

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Margaret Anne Rogers

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP (NYC)

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Saul P Morgenstern

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Interested Party Attorney

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP (Seattle)

1301 Second Ave., Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court concludes that Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP (Hagens Berman) should be appointed, and is hereby appointed, interim lead counsel in these matters. The Court concludes that such appointment will aid in achieving efficiency and economy in what is likely to be expensive and complicated litigation, and that such appointment will enhance fairness to all parties concerned, as well as the proposed classes. (As further set forth herein). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the following motions: Case No. 1:21- cv-351-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 34; Case No. 1:21-cv-00615-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 16; Case No. 1:21-cv-01369-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 25; Case No. 1:21-cv-00421-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 12; Case No. 1:21-cv-01561-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 18; Case No. 1:21-cv-01256-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 18; Case No. 1:21-cv-01130-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No 16. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/15/2021) (nb) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#40

(#40) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Georg von Holtzbrinck GmbH & Co. KG for Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC. Document filed by Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(Mitnick, Joel) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#39

(#39) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel M. Mitnick on behalf of Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(Mitnick, Joel) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#38

(#38) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Michael Swenson on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Swenson, Robert) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#37

(#37) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Leonard White on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(White, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#36

(#36) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate ViacomCBS Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for Simon & Schuster, Inc.. Document filed by Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Buchweitz, Yehudah) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#35

(#35) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yehudah Lev Buchweitz on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Buchweitz, Yehudah) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#53

(#41) ORDER: While Hagens Berman's request for appointment is currently unopposed, the Court wishes to provide an opportunity for interested persons to state their objection, if any, to such appointment. Accordingly, is HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to the appointment of Hagens Berman as interim lead counsel in the above-captioned actions shall be due no later than seven days after the entry of this order; any reply to such opposition shall be due no later than four days after the filing and service of the opposition. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/8/2021) (mro) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#9

(#9) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-00351. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#8

(#8) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Penguin Random House LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#7

(#7) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hachette Book Group, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#6

(#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#5

(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simon & Schuster, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harpercollins Publishers L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#1

(#8) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Penguin Random House LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

29 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court concludes that Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP (Hagens Berman) should be appointed, and is hereby appointed, interim lead counsel in these matters. The Court concludes that such appointment will aid in achieving efficiency and economy in what is likely to be expensive and complicated litigation, and that such appointment will enhance fairness to all parties concerned, as well as the proposed classes. (As further set forth herein). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the following motions: Case No. 1:21- cv-351-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 34; Case No. 1:21-cv-00615-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 16; Case No. 1:21-cv-01369-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 25; Case No. 1:21-cv-00421-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 12; Case No. 1:21-cv-01561-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 18; Case No. 1:21-cv-01256-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No. 18; Case No. 1:21-cv-01130-GHW-DCF, Dkt. No 16. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/15/2021) (nb) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER: While Hagens Berman's request for appointment is currently unopposed, the Court wishes to provide an opportunity for interested persons to state their objection, if any, to such appointment. Accordingly, is HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to the appointment of Hagens Berman as interim lead counsel in the above-captioned actions shall be due no later than seven days after the entry of this order; any reply to such opposition shall be due no later than four days after the filing and service of the opposition. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/8/2021) (mro) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Georg von Holtzbrinck GmbH & Co. KG for Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC. Document filed by Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(Mitnick, Joel) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel M. Mitnick on behalf of Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(Mitnick, Joel) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Michael Swenson on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Swenson, Robert) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Leonard White on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(White, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate ViacomCBS Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for Simon & Schuster, Inc.. Document filed by Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Buchweitz, Yehudah) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yehudah Lev Buchweitz on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Buchweitz, Yehudah) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bertelsmann SE & Co. KGaA for Penguin Random House LLC. Document filed by Penguin Random House LLC..(Morgenstern, Saul) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Margaret Anne Rogers on behalf of Penguin Random House LLC..(Rogers, Margaret) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gregory Bradley Linkh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-00351. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Penguin Random House LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hachette Book Group, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simon & Schuster, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harpercollins Publishers L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeffrey Cook, Susan Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) Modified on 2/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc., Hachette Book Group, HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, Penguin Random House LLC, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23969448)Document filed by Susan Cook, Jeffrey Cook..(Linkh, Gregory) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Penguin Random House LLC is a litigant